EP2265682 - MULTILAYER UV-CURABLE ADHESIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Corporation One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Byoungchul 8950 Diamond Court Cypress CA 90630 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Strohe-Kamp, Geertje, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (FJP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/09] | Application number, filing date | 08733023.9 | 31.03.2008 | [2010/52] | WO2008US58867 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009123608 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265682 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H01L21/78 (EP);
B32B27/00 (KR);
C09J7/22 (EP,KR);
C09J7/38 (EP,KR);
H01L21/6836 (EP,KR);
C09J2203/326 (EP,KR);
C09J2301/208 (EP,KR);
C09J2433/00 (EP,KR);
C09J2463/00 (EP,KR);
C09J2479/08 (EP,KR);
H01L2221/68327 (EP);
H01L2221/68377 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/2919 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE UV-HÄRTBARE KLEBFOLIE | [2010/52] | English: | MULTILAYER UV-CURABLE ADHESIVE FILM | [2010/52] | French: | FILM ADHÉSIF MULTICOUCHE DURCISSABLE AUX UV | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5500294 (SAKUMOTO YUKINORI [JP], et al); | [A]US5912282 (IYER SHRIDHAR R [US], et al); | [A]KR20040032912 (BASF COATINGS AG); | [Y]US6818680 (SHUSTACK PAUL J [US]); | [Y]KR20060033726 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) |