EP2143148 - USE OF A POLYMER COMPOSITE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVOLTAIC AG Isovoltaicstrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states ISOVOLTAIC AG Isovoltastrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | ||
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA AG Isovoltastrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | ||
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Isovaltaic Gmbh Isovoltastrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | ||
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUCKENHUBER, Harald Am Wagrain 76A/5 A-8053 Graz / AT | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Dungler, Karin, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Postfach 264 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Dungler, Karin, et al c/o Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08733262.3 | 08.05.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008AT00159 | Priority number, date | AT20070000734 | 10.05.2007 Original published format: AT 7342007 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008138022 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143148 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2143148 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048, B32B27/34 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (KR);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/0481 (EP,US);
H01L31/049 (EP,US);
B32B2377/00 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31736 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | 21.09.2009 | BA | 21.09.2009 | MK | 21.09.2009 | RS | 21.09.2009 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES KUNSTSTOFFVERBUNDES FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG PHOTOVOLTAISCHER MODULE | [2010/02] | English: | USE OF A POLYMER COMPOSITE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULES | [2010/02] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN COMPOSITE EN MATIÈRE SYNTHÉTIQUE POUR LA FABRICATION DE MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 07.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2013/35] | MT | 29.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0167523 (ISOVOLTA [AT], et al); | [A]US2002128412 (KITAHARA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP0509211 | EP0837088 | DE19720317 |