EP2144617 - DELIVERY OF FLU ANTIBODIES TO SURFACES IN CONTACT WITH AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immuron Limited Level 1 39 Leveson Street North Melbourne, Victoria 3051 / AU | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAWLIN, Grant, Thomas 43 O'Gradys Road Kilmore East, Victoria 3764 / AU | 02 /
LICHTI, Gottfried PO Box 322 Moonee Ponds, Victoria 3039 / AU | 03 /
ROBINS-BROWNE, Roy, Michael 5 Oxford Close Templestowe, Victoria 3106 / AU | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Bewley, Ewan Stuart, et al Ipulse 4 Bloomsbury Place London WC1A 2QA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2010/51] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08733337.3 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008AU00509 | Priority number, date | US20070907621P | 11.04.2007 Original published format: US 907621 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008124870 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144617 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/20, A61K39/02, A61K39/145, A61P31/16 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/04 (EP,US);
A61K35/20 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
C07K16/1018 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | FREISETZUNG VON GRIPPEANTIKÖRPERN AUF OBERFLÄCHEN IN KONTAKT MIT LUFT | [2010/03] | English: | DELIVERY OF FLU ANTIBODIES TO SURFACES IN CONTACT WITH AIR | [2010/03] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'ANTICORPS ANTIGRIPPAUX AU NIVEAU DE SURFACES EN CONTACT AVEC L'AIR | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 18.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]WO2007134327 (SEA LANE BIOTECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [YP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MITCHELL G A ET AL, "Antibody production in milk serum after virus instillation of goat mammary gland. IV. Experiments with protective properties of specific influenza antibody associated with lactogammaglobulin.", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF COMPARATIVE MEDICINE. REVUE CANADIENNE DE MÉDECINE COMPARÉE JAN 1971 LNKD- PUBMED:4251415, (197101), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0008-4050, pages 52 - 59, XP002623137 [Y] 1-15 * tables IV, V * | [Y] - SMITH DAN J ET AL, "Evaluation of novel aerosol formulations designed for mucosal vaccination against influenza virus.", VACCINE 20 JUN 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12798621, (20030620), vol. 21, no. 21-22, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 2805 - 2812, XP002622283 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(03)00224-X | [Y] - LANGLEY JOANNE M ET AL, "Safety and immunogenicity of a Proteosome -trivalent inactivated influenza vaccine, given nasally to healthy adults.", VACCINE 6 MAR 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16303215, (20060306), vol. 24, no. 10, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1601 - 1608, XP002622284 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.VACCINE.2005.09.056 | [Y] - BOT A I ET AL, "Receptor-mediated targeting of spray-dried lipid particles coformulated with immunoglobulin and loaded with a prototype vaccine.", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH JUL 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11496957, (200107), vol. 18, no. 7, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 971 - 979, XP002622285 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - RAMISSE F ET AL, "Effective prophylaxis of influenza A virus pneumonia in mice by topical passive immunotherapy with polyvalent human immunoglobulins or F(ab')2 fragments.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY MAR 1998 LNKD- PUBMED:9528903, (199803), vol. 111, no. 3, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 583 - 587, XP002622286 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - OLIVARES MÓNICA ET AL, "Oral intake of Lactobacillus fermentum CECT5716 enhances the effects of influenza vaccination.", NUTRITION (BURBANK, LOS ANGELES COUNTY, CALIF.) MAR 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17352961, (200703), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0899-9007, pages 254 - 260, XP002622287 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.NUT.2007.01.004 | [Y] - FAHY J V ET AL, "Effect of aerosolized anti-IgE (E25) on airway responses to inhaled allergen in asthmatic subjects.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE SEP 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10471635, (199909), vol. 160, no. 3, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 1023 - 1027, XP002623138 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [YP] - MINNE A ET AL, "Intranasal delivery of whole influenza vaccine prevents subsequent allergen-induced sensitization and airway hyper-reactivity in mice.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY : JOURNAL OF THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY AUG 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17651156, (200708), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 1250 - 1258, XP002622288 [YP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2222.2007.02767.X | [YP] - MINNE ANTOINE ET AL, "The delivery site of a monovalent influenza vaccine within the respiratory tract impacts on the immune response.", IMMUNOLOGY NOV 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17521369, (200711), vol. 122, no. 3, ISSN 0019-2805, pages 316 - 325, XP002622289 [YP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2567.2007.02641.X | International search | [A]WO03080082 (ANADIS LTD [AU], et al); | [A]WO2006053383 (ANADIS LTD [AU], et al); | CN1965665 [ ] (JASON MEDICAL GROUP FAR EAST L [HK]); | [A] - JAKEMAN K.J. ET AL., "Mechanism of immunity to influenza: maternal and passive neonatal protection following immunization of adult ferrets with a live vaccinia-influenza virus haemagglutinin recombinant but not with recombinants containing other influenza virus proteins", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (198906), pages 1523 - 1531, XP001069248 | [A] - WILSON W.D. ET AL., "Passive transfer of maternal immunoglobulin isotype antibodies against tetanus and influenza and their effect on the response of foals to vaccination", EQUINE VETERINARY JOURNAL, (200111), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 644 - 650, XP008122785 | [A] - YASUI H. ET AL., "Protection against influenza virus infection of mice fed Bifidobacterium breve YIT4064", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, (199903), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 186 - 192, XP002288967 | [AP] - CA, Database accession no. (147:52037), XP008114245 | [A] - EYLES J.E. ET AL., "Intranasal administration of Influenza Vaccines: Current Status", BIODRUGS, (200001), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 35 - 59, XP009122294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200013010-00005 | by applicant | - MITCHELL ET AL., CANADIAN JOURNAL OF COMPARATIVE MEDICINE, (197101), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 52 - 59 | - SMITH ET AL., VACCINE, vol. 21, no. 21-22, pages 2805 - 2812 | - LANGLEY ET AL., VACCINE, (20060306), vol. 24, no. 10, pages 1601 - 1 608 | - BOT ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (200107), vol. 18, no. 7, pages 971 - 979 |