EP2132073 - COMPACT COMBINATION BRAKE CYLINDER COMPRISING A MANUAL RELEASE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRASCHKO, Johann Reisdorf 23 1/2 85301 Schweitenkirchen / DE | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Mattusch, Gundula C/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacherstrasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734766.2 | 26.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008EP02365 | Priority number, date | DE20071015212 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015212 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128613 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2132073 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2132073 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/08, B60T17/22 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
B60T17/086 (EP,US);
B60T17/083 (US);
B60T17/22 (EP,US);
F16D2125/10 (US);
F16D2127/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | KOMPAKT-KOMBIZYLINDER MIT MANUELLER LÖSEVORRICHTUNG | [2009/51] | English: | COMPACT COMBINATION BRAKE CYLINDER COMPRISING A MANUAL RELEASE MECHANISM | [2009/51] | French: | CYLINDRE COMBINÉ COMPACT COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE RELÂCHEMENT MANUEL | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | HR | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | AT | 26.03.2013 | IE | 26.03.2013 | LU | 26.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
AT | 26.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
LU | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
AT | 26.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
AT | 26.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0244004 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]DE102005044708 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2006005898 | DE102005044708 |