EP2129479 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WINDING HOT-ROLLED STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖSE, Heinrich Mozartstr. 8 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 02 /
JEPSEN, Olaf-Norman Biedenkopfer Strasse 14 57072 Siegen / DE | 03 /
NIEHUES, Heinz Jakobstrasse 74a 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Heinz, Adolf Höhstrasse 18 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734878.5 | 28.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008EP02511 | Priority number, date | DE20071014748 | 28.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007014748 | DE20081016314 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008016314 | [2009/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008116666 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2129479 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129479 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/06 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
B21C47/063 (EP,US);
B21C47/06 (KR);
B21C47/14 (US);
B21C47/045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFWICKELN VON WARMBAND | [2009/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WINDING HOT-ROLLED STRIP | [2009/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT DE FEUILLARD À CHAUD | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | HR | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | NO | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | LU | 28.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 28.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 28.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
HR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
NO | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE927085 (SANDVIKENS JERNVERKS AB) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE1194807 (UNITED ENG FOUNDRY CO) [A] 1* column 6, line 17 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1026941 (SIEMAG SIEGENER MASCH BAU) [A] 1,5 * page 3, line 29 - line 39; figure 6 *; | [X]US3988916 (MCGEENEY WILLIAM STONE) [X] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 37 - line 59; figure 9; claims 3,5 *; | [A]JPS5832521 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * |