EP2135261 - CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lapp Engineering & Co. Hinterbergstraße 15 6330 Cham / CH | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPP, Siegbert Schilfweg 3 70599 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/13] |
Former [2009/52] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734982.5 | 03.04.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008EP02641 | Priority number, date | DE20071017967 | 10.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007017967 | [2009/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008122401 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135261 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2135261 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/32, H01B7/36 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
H01B7/32 (EP,US);
H01B7/368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KABEL | [2009/52] | English: | CABLE | [2009/52] | French: | CÂBLE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2008 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 03.04.2020 | LU | 03.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.04.2020 | ||
LU | 03.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.04.2020 | ||
LU | 03.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.04.2020 | ||
LU | 03.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 03.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 03.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 03.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5541803 (POPE JR RALPH E [US], et al) [Y] 3,12,21,14 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 5 * * column 6, line 10 - line 14; figure 6 * * column 6, line 1 - line 5 *; | [Y]DE19814540 (ITV GES FUER IND TV MBH [DE]) [Y] 85 * column 2, line 60 - line 62 *; | [Y]DE19955120 (MEINEN HEINZ F [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * column 3, line 21 - line 24 *; | [A]EP1220236 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0009] *; | [XY]FR2830941 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11,13,15-20,22-37,39,44-47,49,51,53,55-58,60-66,68-84 * page 1, line 3 - line 18; figures 1,1A,3 * * page 4, line 6 - line 10 * * page 4, line 17 - line 24; figure 2 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 3 - line 10 * * page 5, line 14 - line 18 * * page 6, line 8 - line 13 * * page 8, line 11 - line 19 * * page 8, line 23 - line 35 * [Y] 3,8,9,12,14,21,38,40-43,48,50,52,54,59,67,85,86; | [Y]WO2004072988 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 59,67 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 3; figure 5 *; | [Y]US2004184747 (KOYASU OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 86 * paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]DE102004051594 (CCS TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 38,41,42,48,50,54,52,43,40 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0068]; figure 3 * |