EP2147214 - BEARING CARRIER MADE OF STEEL WIRE FABRIC FOR A SEPARATING PIPE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILO SE Nortkirchenstrasse 100 44263 Dortmund / DE | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states WILO AG Nortkirchenstrasse 100 44263 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADLER, Andreas Telksheide 2 58640 Iserlohn / DE | [2010/11] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
ADLER, Andreas Brunsiepen 27 58239 Schwerte / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08735245.6 | 15.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008EP02978 | Priority number, date | DE20071023779 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007023779 | [2010/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141703 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147214 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147214 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06, F04D29/046, F04D29/02, F04D29/063, F16C33/08, F16C35/02 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
F04D13/0633 (EP);
F04D13/0626 (EP);
F04D29/026 (EP);
F04D29/0462 (EP);
F04D29/063 (EP);
F16C33/16 (EP);
F16C35/02 (EP);
F05D2230/22 (EP);
F05D2230/51 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | LAGERTRÄGER AUS STAHLDRAHTGESTRICK FÜR EINE SPALTROHRPUMPE | [2010/04] | English: | BEARING CARRIER MADE OF STEEL WIRE FABRIC FOR A SEPARATING PIPE PUMP | [2010/04] | French: | SUPPORT DE PALIER COMPOSÉ D'UN TREILLIS DE FILS D'ACIER POUR UNE POMPE À MOTEUR À GAINE | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 11.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2008 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | HR | 25.05.2011 | IE | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | LV | 25.05.2011 | MT | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | NO | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
HR | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
NO | 25.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB658907 (NAT LEAD CO) [A] 1* page 2, line 43 - line 78; figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE9217976U (GRUNDFOS A/S, BJERRINGBRO, DK) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 9; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5397220 (AKIHISA KAZUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 35; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE19701178 (UMFOTEC UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 15 - line 41; figure 2; claims 1,7-9 * |