EP2140159 - COUPLING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNTER, Frank Egerlandstrasse 24 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
NICKLAS, Götz Im Krautgarten 8 67354 Römerberg / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Leckel, Ulf Leckel Patentanwaltskanzlei P6 Nr.10 (2 Floor) 68161 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Leckel, Ulf Leckel Patentanwaltskanzlei P6 Nr.10 (2 Floor) 68161 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08735292.8 | 17.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP03058 | Priority number, date | DE20071019604 | 24.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007019604 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128695 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140159 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2140159 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/0638, F16D25/10 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D21/06 (EP,US);
F16D25/10 (EP);
F16D2021/0661 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/11] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG | [2015/45] | English: | COUPLING ARRANGEMENT | [2010/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMBRAYAGE | [2010/01] |
Former [2010/01] | KUPPLUNGSNAORDNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.11.2016 | [2017/08] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1174633 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * figure 4 *; | [X]US2005139023 (KRAXNER DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005194229 (GRETHEL MARCO [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1612444 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7* figure 1 * | by applicant | US2005139023 |