EP2135220 - METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE SPATIAL NOISE OF AN IMAGE SENSOR BY LUMINANCE LIMITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/52] | METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE SPACE NOISE OF AN IMAGE SENSOR BY LUMINESCENCE LIMITATION | ||
[2010/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMMING'S, Gilles 12 rue Ronserail F-38100 Grenoble / FR | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Guérin, Michel Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08735582.2 | 28.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008EP53760 | Priority number, date | FR20070002349 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0702349 | [2009/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008125462 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135220 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2135220 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/50 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
H04N25/674 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR DES RÄUMLICHEN RAUSCHENS EINES BILDSENSORS MITTELS LUMINANZBEGRENZUNG | [2010/11] | English: | METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE SPATIAL NOISE OF AN IMAGE SENSOR BY LUMINANCE LIMITATION | [2010/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE CORRECTION DE BRUIT SPATIAL DE CAPTEUR D'IMAGE PAR BORNAGE DES LUMINANCES | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR DES RAUMGERÄUSCHES EINES BILDSENSORS MITTELS LUMINESZENZBEGRENZUNG | ||
Former [2009/52] | METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE SPACE NOISE OF AN IMAGE SENSOR BY LUMINESCENCE LIMITATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 25.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | HR | 14.07.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | IE | 14.07.2010 | LT | 14.07.2010 | LV | 14.07.2010 | MT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | PL | 14.07.2010 | PT | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | NO | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | IS | 14.11.2010 | LU | 28.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 28.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 28.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 28.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0751483 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR], et al); | [A]US6151417 (FLORENT RAOUL [FR]); | [A]US2007047834 (CONNELL JONATHAN H [US]) |