EP2167833 - DISC BRAKE WITH A SPRING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2012/25] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REHM, Joachim Okrifteler Strasse 49 65931 Frankfurt/M / DE | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/25] | Application number, filing date | 08735937.8 | 08.04.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008EP54208 | Priority number, date | DE20071027555 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007027555 | [2012/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008151864 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167833 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167833 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/226, F16D55/00 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
F16D55/226 (EP);
F16D2055/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSE MIT EINER FEDERANORDNUNG | [2010/13] | English: | DISC BRAKE WITH A SPRING ARRANGEMENT | [2010/13] | French: | FREIN À DISQUE COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE RESSORT | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2008 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | HR | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 20.06.2012 | |
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4015167 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,7* figure a *; | [A]DE10004181 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 11 - line 32; figures 1-4b *; | [X]DE10159328 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0031]; figures 4,6,7 *; | [DA]DE10318019 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document * |