EP2132292 - AN ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF SKIN AND HIDE DEGREASING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Lars Fasanvaenget 297 DK-2980 Kokkedal / DK | 02 /
XU, Qing Room 205, Building 823 Zhong Guancun Beijing 100080 / CN | 03 /
PEDERSEN, Niels Kildegaard Soevej 1 B DK-3480 Fredensborg / DK | 04 /
ZHOU, Zhiwei Room 1201, Building 15 Fulaiyin, 70 Shazikou Road Chongwen District Beijing 100075 / CN | [2014/41] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Lars Fasanvaenget 297 DK-2980 Kokkedal / DK | ||
02 /
XU, Qing Room 205, Building 823 Zhong Guancun Beijing 100080 / CN | |||
03 /
PEDERSEN, Niels Kildegaard Soevej 1 B DK-3480 Fredensborg / DK | |||
04 /
ZHOU, Zhiwei Room 1201, Building 15 Fulaiyin, 70 Shazikou Road Chongwen District Beijing 100075 / CN | Application number, filing date | 08735967.5 | 08.04.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008EP54241 | Priority number, date | US20070910702P | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 910702 P | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008122640 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2132292 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2132292 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C14C1/08 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
C14C1/08 (EP,US);
C11D3/38681 (EP,US);
C12N9/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE BEHANDLUNG ZUR TIERHAUTENTFETTUNG | [2009/51] | English: | AN ENZYMATIC TREATMENT OF SKIN AND HIDE DEGREASING | [2009/51] | French: | TRAITEMENT ENZYMATIQUE POUR LE DÉGRAISSAGE DES CUIRS ET PEAUX | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2008 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | GB | 08.04.2015 | IE | 08.04.2015 | LU | 08.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/48] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.04.2008 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.04.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.04.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO02055679 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [DX] 1-24 * page 6, line 10 - line 17 *; | [X]WO02066622 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 7, line 16 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 21 *; | [DX]WO0060063 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DX] 1-24 * claims 6,11,14 *; | [DA]EP0505920 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-24 * abstract *; | [X]WO9425577 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-24 * claims 4-6,21 * | by applicant | EP0258068 | EP0305216 | WO0060063 | WO02066622 | EP0505920 | WO9406942 | WO9012118 | US3840433 | GB233665 | US3986926 | US5869438 | EP0897985 | WO9522625 | WO9600343 | WO9205249 |