EP2140297 - SPLICING DEVICE FOR OPTICAL FIBRES AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SPLICING DEVICE FOR OPTICAL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Technology Inc. 103 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSSAT, Rainer Hainbach 34 83229 Aschau / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08736427.9 | 21.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP54812 | Priority number, date | DE20071019796 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007019796 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008132086 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140297 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/255, G02B6/38 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/2551 (EP,US);
G02B6/2553 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | SPLEIssGERÄT FÜR LICHTLEITFASERN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SPLEIssGERÄTES FÜR LICHTLEITFASERN | [2010/01] | English: | SPLICING DEVICE FOR OPTICAL FIBRES AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SPLICING DEVICE FOR OPTICAL FIBRES | [2010/01] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉPISSURAGE DE FIBRES OPTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN APPAREIL D'ÉPISSURAGE DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0880039 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-31* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0890852 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 3-5 * column 9, line 5 - column 11, line 58; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1130429 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0015] - [0031]; figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US2002003934 (CLARK BRETT G [US]) [X] 1,2,11-31 * paragraphs [0028] - [0047]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-10; | [Y]EP1174744 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraphs [0008] - [0019]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2005106548 (CORNING CABLE SYS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 3-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006280417 (SATO RYUICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraphs [0052] - [0064]; figures 12-16 * |