EP2139666 - TRANSFER DEVICE AND LINEAR-TYPE APPARATUS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel Participations Avenue de la Patrouille de France 76930 Octeville Sur Mer / FR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Kheng Joo c/o SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS Avenue de la Patrouille de France F-76930 OCTEVILLE SUR MER / FR | 02 /
FREIRE DIAZ, Philippe c/o SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS Avenue de la Patrouille de France F-76930 OCTEVILLE SUR MER / FR | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
NG, Kheng Joo c/o SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS Avenue de la Patrouille de France F-76930 OCTEVILLE SUR MER / FR | ||
02 /
FREIRE DIAZ, Philippe c/o SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS Avenue de la Patrouille de France F-76930 OCTEVILLE SUR MER / FR | Representative(s) | Thibaudeau, David A. C. R., et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche F-93500 Pantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Thibaudeau, David A. C. R., et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche F-93500 Pantin / FR | Application number, filing date | 08736448.5 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP54841 | Priority number, date | FR20070054797 | 30.04.2007 Original published format: FR 0754797 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008132090 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139666 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139666 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, B65G47/90 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B29C49/42122 (EP,US);
B29C49/42069 (EP,US);
B65G47/901 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/42073 (EP);
B29C49/42075 (EP);
B29C49/42087 (EP);
B65G2201/0244 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | TRANSFERVORRICHTUNG UND LINEARES GERÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | [2010/01] | English: | TRANSFER DEVICE AND LINEAR-TYPE APPARATUS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF CONTAINERS | [2010/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT ET INSTALLATION DE TYPE LINEAIRE POUR LA FABRICATION DE RECIPIENTS | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2008 | AT | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | HR | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | MT | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | NO | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | LU | 22.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
LU | 22.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2479077 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 1-12 * * page 1, line 28 - line 36 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 15 * * figures 6-10 *; | [A]FR2774666 (SIDEL SA [FR]) [A] 1 * claim - ** figures 6-9 *; | [A]EP1375395 (MAPCO [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] * * column 5 - column 12 * * figure - *; | [DA]FR2879179 (SIDEL SAS [FR]) [DA] 1-19 * claim - * * figure - * |