EP2140138 - SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY ACTUATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Mechatronics Limited St John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Cambridge Mechatronics Limited St John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Cambridge Mechatronics Limited St John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 OWS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOPLISS, Richard 43 Bishops Road Trumpington Cambridge CB2 2NQ / GB | 02 /
HOOLEY, Anthony 79 De Freville Avenue Cambridge CB4 1HP / GB | [2012/15] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
TOPLISS, Richard 43 Bishops Road Trumpington Cambridge CB2 2NQ / GB | ||
02 /
HOOLEY, Anthony 79 De Freville Avenue Cambridge CB4 1HP / GB | Representative(s) | Merryweather, Colin Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08737059.9 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008GB01402 | Priority number, date | GB20070007788 | 23.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0707788 | GB20070009311 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: GB 0709311 | GB20070014718 | 27.07.2007 Original published format: GB 0714718 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008129291 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2140138 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2140138 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, G02B7/08, G03B3/10, F03G7/06 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G03B3/10 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
F03G7/065 (EP);
G02B7/08 (EP);
H04N23/67 (EP,US);
F05C2251/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | F03G7/06, G03B3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | GEDÄCHTNISLEGIERUNGSBETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/01] | English: | SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY ACTUATION APPARATUS | [2010/01] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACTIONNEMENT EN ALLIAGE À MÉMOIRE DE FORME | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 18.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2008 | AT | 11.04.2012 | BE | 11.04.2012 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | HR | 11.04.2012 | IT | 11.04.2012 | LT | 11.04.2012 | LV | 11.04.2012 | MT | 11.04.2012 | NL | 11.04.2012 | PL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | IE | 22.04.2012 | LU | 22.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | NO | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | IS | 11.08.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
LU | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IE | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 11.04.2012 | |
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
HR | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 11.04.2012 | |
NO | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6574958 (MACGREGOR RODERICK [US]) [A] 1,13* paragraph [0102] *; | [A]WO2005026539 (NANOMUSCLE INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0019] - [0024] - [0033] , [0040] - [0043] *; | [A]US2007034818 (GRUMMON DAVID S [US]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] *; | [A]WO2007018086 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [E]EP1914422 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP]) [E] 1,13 * paragraph [0013] * |