EP2150545 - N' - (PHENYL) -N- (MORPHOLIN-4-YL-PYRIDIN-2-YL) -PYRIMIDINE-2, 4-DIAMINE DERIVATIVES AS EPHB4 KINASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARLAAM, Bernard, Christophe AstraZeneca Pharma Z.I. la Pompelle BP1050 Chemin de Vrilly F-51689 Reims Cedex 2 / FR | 02 /
DUCRAY, Richard AstraZeneca Pharma Z.I. la Pompelle BP1050 Chemin de Vrilly F-51689 Reims Cedex 2 / FR | [2010/06] | Application number, filing date | 08737220.7 | 25.04.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008GB50295 | Priority number, date | EP20070301001 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07301001 | EP20070301002 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07301002 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008132505 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150545 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D403/12, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D239/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | 27.11.2009 | BA | 27.11.2009 | MK | 27.11.2009 | RS | 27.11.2009 | Title | German: | Ný-(PHENYL)-N-(MORPHOLIN-4-YLPYRIDIN-2-YL)PYRIMIDIN-2,4-DIAMINDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN VON EPHB4-KINASE ZUR BEHANDLUNG PROLIFERATIVER LEIDEN | [2010/06] | English: | N' - (PHENYL) -N- (MORPHOLIN-4-YL-PYRIDIN-2-YL) -PYRIMIDINE-2, 4-DIAMINE DERIVATIVES AS EPHB4 KINASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE CONDITIONS | [2010/06] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE N' - (PHÉNYL) -N- (MORPHOLIN-4-YL-PYRIDIN-2-YL) -PYRIMIDINE-2, 4-DIAMINEPYRIMIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE EPHB4 KINASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS PROLIFÉRATIFS | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006059234 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007028445 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO2007085833 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PA] 1-13 * the whole document * |