EP2158048 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUXFER GROUP LIMITED The Victoria 150 - 182 Harbour City Salford Quays Salford M50 3SP / GB | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states LUXFER GROUP LIMITED The Victoria 150 - 182 Harbour City Salford Quays M50 3SP / GB | ||
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states LUXFER GROUP LIMITED Victoria House 150 - 182 The Quays Salford Greater Manchester M50 3SP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSEN, Kjeld 3560 Bravata Drive Huntingdon Beach, CA 92649 / US | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08737265.2 | 09.05.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008GB50341 | Priority number, date | US20070747497 | 11.05.2007 Original published format: US 747497 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139222 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2158048 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158048 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/08, B21D51/18, B23K20/12 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
B21C37/0811 (EP,US);
F17C13/00 (US);
B21D51/18 (EP,US);
B23K20/1225 (EP,US);
B23K20/129 (US);
F17C1/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TANKS | [2010/09] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING TANKS | [2010/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE RÉSERVOIRS | [2010/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HR | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | PT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | NO | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0003818 (SIMMONS ANTHONY GRANT [AU]) [A] 1,2,14-17 * page 3, line 14 - line 24; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6364197 (OELGOETZ PETER A [US], et al) [A] 1,19 * column 1, line 38 - line 53; figures 1,2; claim 23 *; | [A]EP1240969 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0087]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2004041005 (TANAKA SUNAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,14,16 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006260376 (OSAME YOSUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * |