EP2232451 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING PRODUCTS IN A VENDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N&W Global Vending S.p.A. Via Roma 24 24030 Valbrembo (Bergamo) / IT | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RONCARI, Aristide, Domenico Via Generale Carlo Alberto Dalla Chiesa 119 I-20037 Paderno Dugnano / IT | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
RONCARI, Aristide, Domenico Via Generale Carlo Alberto Dalla Chiesa 119 I-20037 Paderno Dugnano / IT | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/04] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2010/39] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08737353.6 | 28.03.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008IB00739 | Priority number, date | IT2007TO00894 | 11.12.2007 Original published format: IT TO20070894 | [2010/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009074851 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232451 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232451 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/42 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G07F11/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSFER VON PRODUKTEN IN EINEM VERKAUFSAUTOMATEN | [2010/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING PRODUCTS IN A VENDING MACHINE | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE PRODUITS DANS UN DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 16.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2008 | AT | 23.01.2013 | BE | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | IE | 28.03.2013 | LU | 28.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | GB | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GB | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GB | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GB | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
IE | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19946609 (WURLITZER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1460595 (OHG F LLI MANEA S R L [IT]) [X] 1,2,15,33 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1,2,5-7 *; | [A]DE102005006473 (WURLITZER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-35* the whole document * |