EP2155666 - AZETIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PROSTAGLANDIN E2 ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DACK, Kevin, Neil Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
YEAP, Siew, Kuen Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 03 /
SKERRATT, Sarah, Elizabeth Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2010/08] | Ruddock, Keith Stephen Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08737574.7 | 28.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008IB01070 | Priority number, date | US20070917081P | 10.05.2007 Original published format: US 917081 P | US20070013030 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: US 13030 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139287 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155666 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D205/04, C07D403/12, C07D403/14, C07D405/06, C07D417/14, A61K31/397, A61P29/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C07D205/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/397 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | 10.12.2009 | BA | 10.12.2009 | MK | 10.12.2009 | RS | 10.12.2009 | Title | German: | AZETIDINDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS PROSTAGLANDIN-E2-ANTAGONISTEN | [2010/08] | English: | AZETIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PROSTAGLANDIN E2 ANTAGONISTS | [2010/08] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'AZÉTIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ANTAGONISTES DES PROSTAGLANDINES E2 | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0114079 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 14,15 * page 11; example 9a *; | [X]EP0165637 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 14,15 * page 4; example 1 *; | [X]EP0199413 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 14,15 * column 16; example 15 *; | [A]WO03043980 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 6,9 *; | [A]WO2007044515 (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 1,202; example 7 *; | [PX]WO2007105049 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [PX] 14,15* the whole document *; | [X] - BARTHOLOMEW, DAVID ET AL, "A novel rearrangement reaction: conversion of 3-(chloromethyl)azetidin-2- ones to azetidine-3-carboxylic acid esters", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS , 32(36), 4795-8 CODEN: TELEAY; ISSN: 0040-4039, (1991), XP002496293 [X] 14,15 * table 1; compound 4F * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)92310-4 | by applicant | WO03043980 | - N. TOKUSHIGE; R. MARKHAM; P. RUSSELL; S. FRASER., "Nerve fibres in peritoneal endometriosis", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (2006), vol. 21, pages 3001 - 07 | - N. TOKUSHIGE; R. MARKHAM; P. RUSSELL; S. FRASER., "High density of small nerve fibres in the functional layer of the endometrium in women with endometriosis", HUM REPROD, (2006), vol. 21, pages 782 - 7 | - T. TULANDI; A. FELEMBAN; M. F. CHEN., "Nerve fibers and histopathology of endometriosis-harboring peritoneum", J AM ASSOC GYNECOL LAPAROSC, (2001), vol. 8, pages 95 - 8 | - C. VON ROKITANSKY, "Ueber uterusdruesen-neubildung in uterus und ovarial sarcomen", ZTSCH K K GESELLSCH DER AERZTE ZU WIEN, vol. 37, pages 577 - 81 | - C. L. WALKER, "Role of hormonal and reproductive factors in the etiology and treatment of uterine leiomyoma", RECENT PROGRESS IN HORMONE RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 57, pages 277 - 94 | - C. A. WITZ, "Current concepts in the pathogenesis of endometriosis", CLINICAL OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY, (1999), vol. 42, pages 566 - 85 | - C. A. WITZ., "Pathogenesis of endometriosis.", GYNECOLOGIC & OBSTETRIC INVESTIGATION, (2002), vol. 53, pages 52 - 62 | - M. H. WU; Y. SHOJI; M. C. WU; P. C. CHUANG; C. C. LIN; M. F. HUANG; S. J. TSAI., "Suppression of matrix metalloproteinase-9 by prostaglandin E(2) in peritoneal macrophage is associated with severity of endometriosis", AM J PATHOL., (2005), vol. 167, pages 1061 - 9 | - K. M. ZEITOUN; S. E. BULUN, "Aromatase: a key molecule in the pathophysiology of endometriosis and a therapeutic target", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, (1999), vol. 72, pages 961 - 69 |