EP2147127 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A GRAIN ORIENTED MAGNETIC STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRO SVILUPPO MATERIALI S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 100-102 00129 Roma / IT | [2011/19] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Centro Svilippo Materiali S.P.A. Via di Castel Romano, 100 00129 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABBRUZZESE, Giuseppe c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 100-102 00129 Roma / IT | 02 /
CICALE', Stefano c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 100-102 00129 Roma / IT | 03 /
FORTUNATI, Stefano c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 00129 Roma / IT | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
ABBRUZZESE, Giuseppe c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 100-102 I-00129 Roma Rm / IT | ||
02 /
CICALE', Stefano c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano 100-102 I-00129 Roma Rm / IT | |||
03 /
FORTUNATI, Stefano c/o Centro Sviluppo Materiali S.p.A. Via di Castel Romano I-00129 Roma Rm / IT | Representative(s) | Gitto, Serena, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Gitto, Serena, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 I-00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2010/04] | Di Cerbo, Mario, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 08737908.7 | 18.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008IB51498 | Priority number, date | IT2007RM00218 | 18.04.2007 Original published format: IT RM20070218 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008129490 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2147127 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147127 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2147127 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12, C22C38/02, C22C38/18, C22C38/00, C22C38/16 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C21D8/12 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/1255 (EP,US);
C21D8/1272 (EP,US);
C21D8/1283 (EP,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KORNORIENTIERTEN MAGNETSTREIFENS | [2010/04] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A GRAIN ORIENTED MAGNETIC STRIP | [2010/04] | French: | PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE MAGNÉTIQUE À GRAINS ORIENTÉS | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2010 | BE | 08.12.2010 | CY | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HR | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | LV | 08.12.2010 | MT | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | NO | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | IE | 18.04.2011 | LU | 18.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4592789 (KAWAMO YAKICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6-8 * column 6, lines 50-66; example 2; table 1SteelA *; | [A]EP0566986 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-9* example 1 *; | [A]EP0648847 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,7-9 * abstract * * page 4, lines 23-28 * * page 5, lines 31-50 * * page 10, lines 23-26 *; | [A]JPH07258738 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]EP1411139 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,9 * paragraphs [0068] - [0072] - [0075]; table 1 * |