EP2142154 - TAMPON HAVING A VISUAL INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGHES, Jeanne, Marie 3067 Walnut Grove Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 02 /
BALDRIDGE, Devin, William 1156 North Troy Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45246 / US | 03 /
LENAHAN, Virginia, Anne 3308 Parkhill Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45248 / US | 04 /
SIMS, Cynthia, Marie 7155 Clawson Ridge Court Liberty Township, Ohio 45011 / US | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128 Sambuceto 66020 S. Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | ||
Former [2009/50] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128-130 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | Application number, filing date | 08738059.8 | 01.05.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008IB51698 | Priority number, date | US20070799891 | 03.05.2007 Original published format: US 799891 | US20070800013 | 03.05.2007 Original published format: US 800013 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008135925 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2142154 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A61F13/2051 (EP);
A61F13/55175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | TAMPON MIT VISUELLEM INDIKATOR | [2010/02] | English: | TAMPON HAVING A VISUAL INDICATOR | [2010/02] | French: | TAMPON À INDICATEUR VISUEL | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 14.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006167425 (STELLBRINK BEATE R [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0020] , [0023] , [0028] , [0032] , [0035] , [0039] , [0064] - [0069] - [0074] - [0090] * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2005113807 (CARLIN EDWARD P [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0026] - [0038] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1683503 (ONTEX INTERNAT N V [BE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] - [0016] - [0030] , [0063] , [0064] , [0069] - [0083] *; | [A]DE20010307U (OSTHEIM PATRICIA VON [DE]; MOERLEIN DIETER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |