EP2150946 - AN INTERSECTION-LOCATED DRIVER ALERT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Wall (D.S) Ltd P.O.B 6112 84160 Beer Sheva / IL | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SITBON, David Eduard 5 Shalom Aleichem Street 84365 Beer Sheva / IL | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08738352.7 | 12.05.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008IL00659 | Priority number, date | IL20070183173 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: IL 18317307 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139470 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150946 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/095 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G08G1/095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | AN EINER KREUZUNG ANGEORDNETES FAHRERHINWEISSYSTEM | [2010/06] | English: | AN INTERSECTION-LOCATED DRIVER ALERT SYSTEM | [2010/06] | French: | SYSTÈME PLACÉ À UNE INTERSECTION POUR ALERTER LES CHAUFFEURS | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2014 | 31.05.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19736270 (AMMANN HANS RUDOLF [CH], et al) [A] 1-23 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5917622 (DIFFIN BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [X]US2004027828 (AWA YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0030] , [0040]; figure 7 * | Examination | CH647605 |