EP2133357 - LIVING RADICAL POLYMERIZATION PROMOTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0021 / JP | [2016/42] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Holdings Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGO, Shigeru 3-23 Matsuzaki-cho 3-chome Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-0053 / JP | 02 /
SUGOH, Kunihiko c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd. 463 Kagasuno Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | 03 /
UMEMOTO, Hikaru c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd. 463 Kagasuno Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | [2016/46] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
YAMAGO, Shigeru 3-23 Matsuzaki-cho 3-chome Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-0053 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGOH, Kunihiko c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd. 463 Kagasuno Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
UMEMOTO, Hikaru c/o Otsuka Chemical Co. Ltd. 463 Kagasuno Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2009/51] | Hollatz, Christian ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08738642.1 | 06.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008JP54554 | Priority number, date | JP20070057844 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007057844 | [2009/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108500 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133357 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2133357 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/94, C08F4/72, C08F20/18, // C08F2/38 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
C08F4/72 (EP,US);
C07F9/94 (EP,US);
C08F120/14 (EP,US);
C08F120/18 (EP,US);
C08F2/38 (EP,US);
C08F4/58 (EP,US);
C08F112/08 (EP,US);
C08F220/14 (EP,US);
C08F2438/00 (EP,US);
C08F293/005 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | C07F9/94, C08F4/72, // C08F2/38 | ||
Former IPC [2009/51] | C07F9/94, C08F4/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FÖRDERMITTEL ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG LEBENDER RADIKALE | [2009/51] | English: | LIVING RADICAL POLYMERIZATION PROMOTER | [2009/51] | French: | PROMOTEUR DE LA POLYMÉRISATION DE RADICAUX VIVANTS | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2009 | Translation filed | 04.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 27.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2008 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IE | 06.03.2017 | LU | 06.03.2017 | MT | 06.03.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.03.2008 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.03.2008 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.03.2008 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
MT | 06.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
IE | 06.03.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.03.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ATWOOD D A ET AL, "Synthesis and Structural Characterization of a Homoleptic Bismuth Arenethiolate", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, US, (19930101), vol. 32, doi:10.1021/IC00065A030, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 2972 - 2974, XP008116677 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00065a030 | [X] - CLEGG W ET AL, "Neutral Thiolates of Antimony (III) and Bismuth (III)", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (19950101), no. 13, ISSN 1472-7773, pages 2129 - 2135, XP008116841 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [L] - EIICHI KAYAHARA ET AL, "Development of an Arylthiobismuthine Cocatalyst in Organobismuthine-Mediated Living Radical Polymerization: Applications for Synthesis of Ultrahigh Molecular Weight Polystyrenes and Polyacrylates", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20090225), vol. 131, no. 7, doi:10.1021/ja8092899, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2508 - 2513, XP055139074 [L] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja8092899 | [L] - YAMAGO, SHIGERU ET AL, "A new thiobismuthine cocatalyst in organobismuthine-mediated living radical polymerization", POLYMER PREPRINTS -THE 236TH ACS NATIONAL MEETING,(SESSION:5TH CONTROLLED/LIVING RADICAL POLYMERIZATION SYMPOSIUM), AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DIVISION OF POLYMER CHEMISTRY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (20080817), vol. 49, no. 2, ISSN 0032-3934, page 201, XP002729493 [L] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS63174926 (NITTO KASEI CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-2 * , Preparation example 10; compounds 91 to 99 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2006062255 (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , Claims; examples (Family: none) * | [X] - DAVID A. ATWOOD et al., "Synthesis and Structural Characterization of a Homoleptic Bismuth Arenethiolate", Inorg. Chem., (19930000), vol. 32, pages 2972 - 2974, XP008116677 [X] 1-2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00065a030 | [X] - WILLIAM CLEGG et al., "Neutral Thiolates of Antimony(III) and Bismuth(III)", J. CHEM. SOC. DALTON TRANS., (19950000), pages 2129 - 2135, XP008116841 [X] 1-2 | by applicant | WO2004014962 | JP2005041321 | - CHEM. REV., (1982), vol. 82, page 15 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1994), vol. 33, page 1178 | - ORGANOMETALLICS, (1982), vol. 1, page 1408 |