EP2130665 - BONDING METHOD OF RESIN MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIHARA, Kanji c/o Konica Minolta Opto Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | 02 /
UEHIRA, Masayoshi c/o Konica Minolta Opto Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08738677.7 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008JP55084 | Priority number, date | JP20070080739 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007080739 | [2009/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008117717 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130665 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/16, // B01L3/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C65/16 (KR);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B29C65/1635 (EP,US);
B29C65/1683 (EP,US);
B29C66/0042 (EP,US);
B29C66/006 (EP,US);
B29C66/348 (EP,US);
B29C66/41 (EP,US);
B29C66/53461 (EP,US);
B29C66/733 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/81265 (EP,US);
B29C66/81267 (EP,US);
B29C66/81268 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/12 (EP,US);
B29C65/1616 (EP,US);
B29C65/1641 (EP,US);
B29C65/1654 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73161 (EP);
B29C66/7352 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/9161 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
B29C66/929 (EP,US);
B29C66/934 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2833/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2869/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2905/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2909/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/38 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2823/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2905/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2009/50] | B29C65/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BINDUNG EINES HARZELEMENTS | [2009/50] | English: | BONDING METHOD OF RESIN MEMBER | [2009/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LIAGE D'UN ÉLÉMENT EN RÉSINE | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2009 | Translation filed | 22.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 29.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2013 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.11.2013 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005109452 (BASQUE ROLAND [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * paragraphs [0064] , [0066]; figures 4,7E; claims 8,12,3 * [I] 2,3,6; | [I]JPS62142092 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [I] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [A]WO0003865 (LISA LASER PRODUCTS OHG FUHRBE [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,6,7 * page 11, lines 8-23; figure 3 *; | [A]WO0226476 (OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 9, lines 12-20; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]WO03028982 (OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 7, lines 24-32; figures 1,2,4 * | International search | [X]JPS62142092 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01310934 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [Y]JPH04157082 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2005262531 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2005074775 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) | by applicant | JP2005074775 | JP2005074796 |