EP2136151 - HEAT PUMP TYPE HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS AND HEATING AND HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/52] | HEAT PUMP TYPE HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS AND HEATING HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS | ||
[2017/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUI, Syuuji c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
NUMATA, Mitsuharu c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2017/35] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
FURUI, Syuuji c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
NUMATA, Mitsuharu c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2009/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08738755.1 | 24.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008JP55416 | Priority number, date | JP20070081210 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007081210 | JP20080066068 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008066068 | [2009/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008123187 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136151 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2136151 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/18, F24H1/00, F24H9/00, F28D1/047, F28D1/06, F28F13/08, F24D3/08, F24D11/02, F28D20/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
F24D11/0228 (EP,US);
F24D3/087 (EP,US);
F24D3/18 (EP,US);
F24H4/04 (EP,US);
F28D1/0213 (EP,US);
F28D1/0472 (EP,US);
F28D20/0034 (EP,US);
F28F13/08 (EP,US);
F24D2200/08 (EP,US);
F24D2200/12 (EP,US);
F24D2220/06 (EP,US);
F24D2220/08 (EP,US);
F24D2220/209 (EP,US);
F24D2240/10 (EP,US);
F24D2240/12 (EP,US);
F24D2240/20 (EP,US);
F24D2240/22 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0078 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | F24H1/18, F24H1/00, F24H9/00, F28D1/047, F28D1/06, F28F13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMEPUMPENÄHNLICHE WARMWASSERVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HEIZUNGS- UND WARMWASSERVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/34] | English: | HEAT PUMP TYPE HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS AND HEATING AND HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS | [2017/34] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FOURNITURE D'EAU CHAUDE DE TYPE POMPE À CHALEUR ET APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE ET FOURNITURE D'EAU CHAUDE | [2017/34] |
Former [2009/52] | WÄRMEPUMPENÄHNLICHE WARMWASSERVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUFHEIZEN EINER WARMWASSERVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2009/52] | HEAT PUMP TYPE HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS AND HEATING HOT WATER SUPPLY APPARATUS | ||
Former [2009/52] | INSTALLATION DE FOURNITURE D'EAU CHAUDE DE TYPE POMPE À CHALEUR ET APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE D'EAU CHAUDE POUR LE CHAUFFAGE | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2009 | Translation filed | 30.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 13.06.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2008 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 24.03.2018 | LU | 24.03.2018 | MT | 24.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.03.2008 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
MT | 24.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
MT | 24.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
MT | 24.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2005326078 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,6; | [Y]WO2006036121 (THERMIA VAERME AB [SE], et al) [Y] 3 * page 4, line 7 - line 26 *; | [Y]DE4317441 (SCHMOELE GMBH KM [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 18 - column 3, line 64; figure . *; | [Y]FR2519415 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2468084 (RIDEL FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2003185271 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006322643 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000035290 (MARUYAMA NOBORU); | [Y]JP2001221501 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004286292 (DENSO CORP) | Examination | JP2003185271 | by applicant | JP2006329581 |