EP2141407 - LIGHTING APPARATUS AND LIGHTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6 Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KON, Tomoya c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION SHIGA GAMO PLANT 10-1 Kawai-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 529-1595 / JP | [2015/20] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
KON, Tomoya c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION SHIGA GAMO PLANT 10-1 Kawai-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 529-1595 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08739202.3 | 28.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008JP56084 | Priority number, date | JP20070083937 | 28.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007083937 | JP20070143960 | 30.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007143960 | [2010/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008117865 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141407 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141407 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, F21S2/00, F21S8/04, F21V7/09, F21V14/00, H01L33/00, F21Y101/02 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F21V7/06 (EP,US);
F21K9/68 (EP,US);
F21V7/0083 (EP,US);
F21V7/09 (EP,US);
F21S2/005 (EP,US);
F21V7/0091 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT | [2010/01] | English: | LIGHTING APPARATUS AND LIGHTING UNIT | [2010/01] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2009 | Translation filed | 28.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2008 | AT | 13.05.2015 | BE | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.03.2008 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2365962 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, line 6 - line 10 * * page 7, line 26 - line 30 * [Y] 6; | [Y]EP1741975 (INGOLF DIEZ SIMEON MEDIZINTECH [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * figure 4 *; | [AD]JP2007059930 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AD] 1-9 | International search | [X]JP2007059371 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 10 * Par. Nos. [0030], [0035]; Figs. 1 to 5 & WO 2007/072919 A1 *; | [A]JP3787148B (Kabushiki Kaisha Mirai) [A] 1-15 * Full text; all drawings & WO 2006/059422 A1 *; | [A]JP2003529792 (Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.) [A] 1-15 * Full text; all drawings & WO 2001/075487 A2 *; | [A]JP2006156074 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005340184 (TORAY DU PONT KK) [A] 1-15 * Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [AE]JP4018744B (Mirai Environment Development Laboratory Co., Ltd.) [AE] 1-15 * Full text; all drawings (Family: none) * |