EP2136164 - REFRIGERANT CHARGING DEVICE, REFRIGERATION DEVICE, AND REFRIGERANT CHARGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Satoshi c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
OKA, Masahiro c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
TANI, Kazuhiko c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | 04 /
OKAMOTO, Atsushi c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-Ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
KAWANO, Satoshi c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
OKA, Masahiro c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
TANI, Kazuhiko c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | |||
04 /
OKAMOTO, Atsushi c/o Kanaoka Factory Sakai Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1304 Kanaoka-cho Kita-Ku Sakai-shi Osaka 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2009/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08739995.2 | 07.04.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008JP56892 | Priority number, date | JP20070105744 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007105744 | [2009/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008132982 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136164 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2136164 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25B45/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
F25B45/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B49/02 (KR);
F25B2345/001 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2515 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1933 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLMITTELEINFÜLLVORRICHTUNG, KÜHLGERÄT UND KÜHLMITTELEINFÜLLVERFAHREN | [2009/52] | English: | REFRIGERANT CHARGING DEVICE, REFRIGERATION DEVICE, AND REFRIGERANT CHARGING METHOD | [2009/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE, DISPOSITIF DE RÉFRIGÉRATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÈNE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2009 | Translation filed | 29.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 27.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2008 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | IE | 07.04.2019 | LU | 07.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.04.2008 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.04.2019 | ||
LU | 07.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.04.2019 | ||
LU | 07.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 07.04.2019 | ||
LU | 07.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 07.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3813893 (GEMENDER J, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 18; figure - *; | [X]US2003226367 (PALMER JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0029] - [0031]; figure - *; | [X]US3875755 (ANDERSON RICHARD M, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 6; figure - *; | [X]US5231841 (MCCLELLAND RALPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, lines 43-56 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 37 * * column 6, lines 5-10 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 10 * * column 9, lines 35-68; figure - * | International search | [Y]JP2006010117 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENG); | [Y]JP2006207925 (SHOWA TANSAN KK); | [Y]JP2000274891 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2001074342 (SANDEN CORP); | [Y]JP2005241050 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN); | [Y]JP2005114184 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH04240365 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2005241172 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | Examination | US3400552 |