EP2058902 - DUAL POLARIZATION WAVE ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Nec Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURAMOTO, Akio c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | 02 /
YUSA, Hiroyuki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08740234.3 | 11.04.2008 | [2009/20] | WO2008JP57136 | Priority number, date | JP20070104837 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007104837 | [2009/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008133033 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058902 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/24, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/16, H01Q9/42, H04B7/10, H01Q9/20, H01Q9/26, H01Q7/02 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H01Q9/16 (EP,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q7/02 (EP,US);
H01Q9/20 (EP,US);
H01Q9/265 (EP,US);
H04B7/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/20] | H01Q21/24, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/16, H01Q9/42, H04B7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/19] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNE MIT DOPPELTER POLARISATIONSWELLE | [2009/20] | English: | DUAL POLARIZATION WAVE ANTENNA | [2009/20] | French: | ANTENNE À DOUBLE POLARISATION | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | Translation filed | 07.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 13.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6337666 (BISHOP BRUCE [US]) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 55 * * figures 6-9 * * abstract *; | [Y]US2002024474 (CHEN TAI-LEE [TW]) [Y] 5 * page 1, paragraph 19 - page 2, paragraph 26 * * figures 4-6 * * abstract *; | [XY]US2002057227 (FANG SHYH-TIRNG [TW]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 5, paragraph 49 * * figures 2-7B * * abstract * [Y] 5-13; | [A]WO2005001989 (RHODE ISLAND EDUCATION [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 19, line 5 - line 28 * * figures 24-26 ** abstract *; | [Y]EP1538705 (HARADA IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6-13 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 4 * * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US2006170605 (TANG CHIA-LUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 23 - paragraph 24 * * figures 2A-3B * * abstract *; | [IY]US2006227061 (LITTLEFIELD FREDERICK H [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * page 1, paragraph 17 - page 3, paragraph 27 * * figures 2-4 * * abstract * [Y] 5-13 | International search | [A]JPH077321 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2003514422 ; | [A]JP2005094088 (ANTENNA GIKEN KK); | [A]WO2006031276 (RAYTHEON CO [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH0786825 | JPH0964639 | JPH10107533 | JP2003347822 | JP2005167705 | JP2007104837 |