EP2145838 - ELECTRONIC COMPONENT PACKING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd. 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMATSU, Masayuki C/O SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO. LTD 5-8 Higashi-Shinagawa 2-Chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08740470.3 | 09.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008JP57389 | Priority number, date | JP20070104052 | 11.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007104052 | [2010/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008126938 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145838 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/38, B32B27/08, B65D65/40, B65D73/02, B65D85/86, H05K9/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B65D85/00 (KR);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/38 (EP,US);
B32B27/42 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (KR);
B65D73/02 (KR);
B65D75/327 (EP,US);
B65D85/38 (EP,US);
H05K13/0084 (EP,US);
H05K9/0067 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2439/00 (EP,US);
B65D2213/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | B65D85/38, B32B27/08, B65D65/40, B65D73/02, B65D85/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSKÖRPER FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE BAUELEMENTE | [2010/03] | English: | ELECTRONIC COMPONENT PACKING BODY | [2010/03] | French: | CORPS D'EMBALLAGE DE COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2009 | Translation filed | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0476895 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 47-48 - page 5, line 7; claim 1 *; | [X]US5369179 (HAVENS MARVIN R [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US5599621 (AKHTER SOHAIL [US]) [X] 1-3 * example 1 9 10 11 14 * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2001179870 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 9] , [0 11] , [0 13]; claims 5, 6, 8, 9 * [Y] 4,5,7; | [XY]JP2003128132 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [2 5 6 7 9] * [Y] 4,5,7; | [X]EP1553142 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,7 * claims 1, 13, 20 *; | [X]JP2007038664 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD) [X] 1* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2001179870 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2003128132 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JP2004196979 |