EP2125894 - BINDING PROTEINS, INCLUDING ANTIBODIES, ANTIBODY DERIVATIVES AND ANTIBODY FRAGMENTS, THAT SPECIFICALLY BIND CD154 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states UCB Biopharma SPRL Allée de la Recherche, 60 1070 Brussels / BE | [2019/02] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 250 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states UCB Biopharma SPRL Allée de la Recherche, 60 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 250 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states UCB Pharma, S.A. 60, allée de la Recherche 1070 Brussels / BE | |||
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA, Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states UCB Pharma, S.A. 60, allée de la Recherche 1070 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKLY, Linda C. 34 Winthrop Street West Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | 02 /
FERRANT-ORGETTAS, Janine L. 8 Glenmere Avenue Gloucester, Massachusetts 01930 / US | 03 /
GARBER, Ellen A. 14 Donnell Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | 04 /
HSU, Yen-ming 3 Douglas Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | 05 /
SU, Lihe 976 Main Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | 06 /
TAYLOR, Frederick R. 98 Gulliver Street Milton, Massachusetts 02186 / US | 07 /
ADAMS, Ralph UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 08 /
BROWN, Derek Thomas UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 09 /
POPPLEWELL, Andrew George UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 10 /
ROBINSON, Martyn Kim UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 11 /
SHOCK, Anthony UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 12 /
TYSON, Kerry Louise UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [2018/51] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
BURKLY, Linda C. 34 Winthrop Street West Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | ||
02 /
FERRANT-ORGETTAS, Janine L. 8 Glenmere Avenue Gloucester, Massachusetts 01930 / US | |||
03 /
GARBER, Ellen A. 14 Donnell Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | |||
04 /
HSU, Yen-ming 3 Douglas Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | |||
05 /
SU, Lihe 976 Main Street Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | |||
06 /
TAYLOR, Frederick R. 98 Gulliver Street Milton, Massachusetts 02186 / US | |||
07 /
ADAMS, Ralph UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
08 /
BROWN, Derek Thomas UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
09 /
POPPLEWELL, Andrew George UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
10 /
ROBINSON, Martyn Kim UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
11 /
SHOCK, Anthony UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | |||
12 /
TYSON, Kerry Louise UCB Celltech 208 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/51] |
Former [2010/14] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08742182.2 | 21.03.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US03735 | Priority number, date | US20070919816P | 22.03.2007 Original published format: US 919816 P | US20070919938P | 22.03.2007 Original published format: US 919938 P | US20070920495P | 27.03.2007 Original published format: US 920495 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008118356 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2125894 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2125894 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C07K16/2875 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (US);
C07K2317/40 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/71 (EP,US);
C07K2317/734 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2009 | BA | 31.03.2009 | MK | 31.03.2009 | RS | 31.03.2009 | Title | German: | BINDUNGSPROTEINE MIT ANTIKÖRPERN, ANTIKÖRPERDERIVATEN UND ANTIKÖRPERFRAGMENTEN MIT SPEZIFISCHER BINDUNG AN CD154 SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2009/49] | English: | BINDING PROTEINS, INCLUDING ANTIBODIES, ANTIBODY DERIVATIVES AND ANTIBODY FRAGMENTS, THAT SPECIFICALLY BIND CD154 AND USES THEREOF | [2009/49] | French: | PROTÉINES DE LIAISON, INCLUANT DES ANTICORPS, DÉRIVÉS D'ANTICORPS ET FRAGMENTS D'ANTICORPS, QUI SE LIENT SPÉCIFIQUEMENT À CD154 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 10.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18207475.7 / EP3524626 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0168860 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,13,16-19,21-24,30,32-51,53-75,82-84 * example 1 *; | [A]WO0218446 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-84 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0218445 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-84* the whole document *; | [DA]WO2004051268 (CELLTECH R&D LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-84 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005003175 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-84 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005011376 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-84 * page 51; table 7 *; | [A]WO2005035572 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 51 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2006033702 |