EP2148882 - PROCESS FOR MAKING TOPOTECAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ScinoPharm Taiwan, Ltd. 1, Nan-Ke 8th Road Tainan Science-Based, Industrial Park Industrial Park Tainan County 74144 / TW | [2013/08] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Scinopharm Taiwan, Ldt. 1 Nan-ke 8th Road Tainan Science-Based Industrial Park Tainan County 74144 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Tsung-Cheng No. 140, Dongmen Road Yongjing Township Changhua County, 512 / TW | 02 /
HARN, Piin-Jye No. 14, Lane 506 Sindu Road South District Tainan 702 / TW | [2012/25] |
Former [2010/05] | 01 /
HU, Tsung-Cheng No. 140, Dongmen Road Yongjing Township Changhua County, 512 / TW | ||
02 /
HARN, Piin-Jye No. 14, Lane 506 Sindu Road South District Tainan 702 / TW | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/05] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08742705.0 | 10.04.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US04610 | Priority number, date | US20070922918P | 11.04.2007 Original published format: US 922918 P | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008127606 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148882 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2148882 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2148882 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/22, C07D491/14 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
C07D491/22 (EP,US);
C07D491/14 (KR);
A61K31/4353 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TOPOTECAN | [2010/05] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING TOPOTECAN | [2010/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU TOPOTÉCAN | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/01] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | BE | 20.06.2012 | |
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5004758 (BOEHM JEFFREY C [US], et al) [Y] 1-13* examples 3-7,10-13, etc *; | [Y] - L. A. Paquette (editor), Encyclopedia of reagents for organic synthesis, John Wiley & Sons, (19950101), vol. 3, pages 2090 - 2093, XP002575696 [Y] 1-13 *equation (11) *; page 2090, column rh * * page 2092, paragraph last * | International search | [X]US5004758 (BOEHM JEFFREY C [US], et al); | [X]WO2005046608 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | [X] - CHEN ET AL., "Studies on the polymorph of topotecan hydrochloride and its stability", ZHONGGUO SHENGHUA YAOWU ZAZHI, (2005), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 279 - 281, XP001248432 | [X] - VOGT ET AL., "A study of variable hydration states in topotecan hydrochloride", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (2006), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 1080 - 1088, XP005296966 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2005.08.032 |