EP2145034 - Denim fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/03] | ELASTIC COMPOSITE YARNS AND WOVEN FABRICS MADE THEREFROM, AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING THE SAME | ||
[2016/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Textile Group, Inc. 804 Green Valley Road Suite 300 Greensboro, NC 27408 / US | [2016/47] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states International Textile Group, Inc. 804 Green Valley Road Suite 300 Greensboro, NC 27408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THARPE, Ralph, B., Jr. 5390 Beechmont Drive Greensboro, NC 27410 / US | 02 /
ALLEN, John, L., Jr. 36 Park Village Lane Greensboro, NC 27455 / US | 03 /
LITTLE, Fulton, A. 612 South Greene Street Wadesboro, NC 28170 / US | 04 /
HART, Reuben, E. 1202 Eagle Road Greensboro, NC 27407 / US | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | van Wijk, Alexander Pieter, et al Mainstay IP Kallenkoterallee 82 A 8331 AJ Steenwijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | van Wijk, Alexander Pieter, et al Mainstay IP De Tuinen 16 8471 XP Wolvega / NL | ||
Former [2010/03] | DeltaPatents B.V. Fellenoord 370 5611 ZL Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08742948.6 | 16.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US04900 | Priority number, date | US20070907774P | 17.04.2007 Original published format: US 907774 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130563 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145034 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145034 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/32, D03D15/08 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
D02G3/324 (EP,US);
D02G3/32 (US);
D01H1/00 (US);
D01H1/02 (US);
D02G3/328 (EP,US);
D02G3/36 (US);
D03D15/56 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3024 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3073 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3081 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | D02G3/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Denimgewebe | [2016/37] | English: | Denim fabric | [2016/37] | French: | Tissu denim | [2016/37] |
Former [2010/03] | ELASTISCHE VERBUNDGARNE UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE GEWEBE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | ||
Former [2010/03] | ELASTIC COMPOSITE YARNS AND WOVEN FABRICS MADE THEREFROM, AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING THE SAME | ||
Former [2010/03] | FILS COMPOSITES ÉLASTIQUES ET TISSUS FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI, ET PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR LEUR FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16200120.0 / EP3208371 | EP18174297.4 / EP3385416 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2008 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | IE | 16.04.2017 | LU | 16.04.2017 | MT | 16.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.04.2008 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.04.2017 | ||
LU | 16.04.2017 | ||
MT | 16.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.04.2008 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.04.2017 | ||
LU | 16.04.2017 | ||
MT | 16.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.04.2017 | ||
LU | 16.04.2017 | ||
MT | 16.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
IE | 16.04.2017 | ||
LU | 16.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3127731 (MCKINNON ALLEN G) [I] 1-20 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 46; figure 1 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 6 *; | [I]EP1350872 (FAYTEX CORP [US]) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061]; figure 7 *; | [I]CN1632204 (JIANGSU SUNSHINE CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1,10,14,17* page 1; figures 1-2 *; | [XI]WO2006051384 (TEXTRONICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,14 * paragraph [00025] - paragraph [00027] * * paragraph [00042] - paragraph [00046] * * paragraph [00051] - paragraph [00063]; claim 15 * [I] 7,8,11-13,15; | [XI]WO2006051380 (TEXTRONICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,14 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [00015] * * paragraph [00028] - paragraph [00032] * * paragraph [00037] - paragraph [00043] * * paragraph [00048] * [I] 7-9,11-13,15 | International search | [X]US3596458 (NAKANO HIROSHI, et al); | [Y]US5568719 (PROCTOR CHARLES W [US]); | [A]US2004237494 (KARAYIANNI ELENI [CN], et al) | by applicant | US3127731 | US4470250 | US4998403 | US5272236 | US5278272 | US5322728 | US5380810 | US5472775 | US5478514 | US5560192 | US5645542 | US5735110 | US6140442 | US6225243 | US6460322 | US6500540 | EP1350872 | US6709742 | CN1632204 | WO2006051384 | WO2006051380 | US7134265 |