EP2152142 - DEVICE AND ASSEMBLY FOR POSITIONING, STABILIZING AND TREATING AN EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oraya Therapeutics, INC. 8000 Jarvis Avenue Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERTNER, Michael 520 Laurel Street Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
ARNOLDUSSEN, Mark 127 Park Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
HERRON, Matt 3519 Altamont Way Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | [2010/12] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
GERTNER, Michael 520 Laurel Street Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
02 /
ARNOLDUSSEN, Mark 127 Park Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | |||
03 /
HERRON, Matt 1050 Mcgregor Way Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/25] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. 9-10 Savile Row London W1S 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08743035.1 | 17.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008US04999 | Priority number, date | US20070933220P | 04.06.2007 Original published format: US 933220 P | US20070879843 | 18.07.2007 Original published format: US 879843 | US20070879901 | 18.07.2007 Original published format: US 879901 | US20070833939 | 03.08.2007 Original published format: US 833939 | US20070016472P | 23.12.2007 Original published format: US 16472 P | US20080020655P | 11.01.2008 Original published format: US 20655 P | US20080023968 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 23968 | US20080023954 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 23954 | US20080023884 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 23884 | US20080023905 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 23905 | US20080024934 | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 24934 | US20080026507 | 05.02.2008 Original published format: US 26507 | US20080027094 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: US 27094 | US20080027069 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: US 27069 | US20080027083 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: US 27083 | US20080100398 | 09.04.2008 Original published format: US 100398 | [2010/15] |
Former [2010/07] | US20070933220P | 04.06.2007 | |
US20070879843 | 18.07.2007 | ||
US20070879901 | 18.07.2007 | ||
US20070833939 | 03.08.2007 | ||
US20070016472 | 23.12.2007 | ||
US20080020655 | 11.01.2008 | ||
US20080023968 | 31.01.2008 | ||
US20080023954 | 31.01.2008 | ||
US20080023884 | 31.01.2008 | ||
US20080023905 | 31.01.2008 | ||
US20080024934 | 01.02.2008 | ||
US20080026507 | 05.02.2008 | ||
US20080027094 | 06.02.2008 | ||
US20080027069 | 06.02.2008 | ||
US20080027083 | 06.02.2008 | ||
US20080100398 | 09.04.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008150330 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152142 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152142 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/008, A61B3/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
A61F9/008 (EP);
A61B3/113 (EP);
A61B3/152 (EP);
A61F9/009 (EP);
A61N5/1017 (EP);
A61N5/1049 (EP);
A61B17/0231 (EP);
A61B3/12 (EP);
A61F2009/00846 (EP);
A61F2009/00865 (EP);
A61F9/00804 (EP);
A61F9/00808 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | A61B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ANORDNUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG, STABILISIERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG EINES AUGES | [2010/07] | English: | DEVICE AND ASSEMBLY FOR POSITIONING, STABILIZING AND TREATING AN EYE | [2010/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET ENSEMBLE POUR LE POSITIONNEMENT, LA STABILISATION ET LE TRAITEMENT D'UN OEIL | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 30.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP13160734.3 / EP2606864 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2008 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | IE | 17.04.2014 | LU | 17.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.04.2008 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 17.04.2014 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 17.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2231277 (ORAYA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *; | WO2009085204 [ ] (ORAYA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]; GERTNER MICHAEL [US]; ARNOLDUSSEN MARK [U) [ ] * the whole document *; | [E]EP2152145 (ORAYA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *; | WO2008150331 [ ] (ORAYA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]; GERTNER MICHAEL [US]; ARNOLDUSSEN MARK [U) [ ] * the whole document *; | [XY]US2006287662 (BERRY MICHAEL J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * [Y] 11; | [XY]US2006271025 (JONES JEFFREY W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0135] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0178] * * paragraph [0179] * [Y] 11; | [XY]US2006192921 (LOESEL FRIEDER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] * [Y] 11; | [Y]US7178666 (HUANG JOEY [US]) [Y] 11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5336215 (HSUEH CHI-FU [US], et al); | [Y]US6126668 (BAIR SCOTT S [US], et al); | [Y]US6837862 (DRIVER JR JOHN ALLEN [US]); | [Y]US2006192921 (LOESEL FRIEDER [DE], et al); | [Y]US7139601 (BUCHOLZ RICHARD D [US], et al); | [X]US2006271025 (JONES JEFFREY W [US], et al); | [Y]US7178666 (HUANG JOEY [US]) |