EP2149080 - A TOUCHSCREEN FOR DETECTING MULTIPLE TOUCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elo Touch Solutions, Inc. 1033 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2014/33] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Elo Touch Solutions, Inc. 301 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENT, Joel, C. 35937 Gaskell Court Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 02 /
AROYAN, James, L. 1471 Creekview Lane Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | 03 /
GAO, Ting 1055 Escalon Avenue Apartment 902 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 04 /
TANAKA, Yoshikazu Nagasawa-terrace A-1 1-14-13 Ushikubo-nishi Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama Kanagawa 224-0015 / JP | 05 /
SCHARFF, Daniel, H. 926 Arbor Drive San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | [2014/31] |
Former [2010/05] | 01 /
KENT, Joel, C. 35937 Gaskell Court Fremont, CA 94536 / US | ||
02 /
AROYAN, James, L. 1471 Creekview Lane Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | |||
03 /
GAO, Ting 1055 Escalon Avenue Apartment 902 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Yoshikazu Nagasawa-terrace A-1 1-14-13 Ushikubo-nishi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 224-0015 / JP | |||
05 /
SCHARFF, Daniel, H. 926 Arbor Drive San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | ||
Former [2010/05] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08743243.1 | 23.04.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US05286 | Priority number, date | US20070789776 | 25.04.2007 Original published format: US 789776 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008133941 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2149080 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149080 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042, G06F3/043 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/0421 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0304 (KR);
G06F3/0354 (KR);
G06F3/0436 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04104 (KR,US);
G06F2203/04106 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSSCHIRM ZUM DETEKTIEREN MEHRERER BERÜHRUNGEN | [2010/05] | English: | A TOUCHSCREEN FOR DETECTING MULTIPLE TOUCHES | [2010/05] | French: | ÉCRAN TACTILE POUR DÉTECTER PLUSIEURS CONTACTS | [2014/11] |
Former [2010/05] | ÉCRAN TACTILE POUR DÉTECTION DE MULTIPLES TOUCHES TACTILES | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14178896.8 / EP2804080 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2008 | AT | 30.07.2014 | BE | 30.07.2014 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | IE | 23.04.2015 | LU | 23.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
IE | 23.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5854450 (KENT JOEL [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11,12 * column 42, line 52 - column 44, line 16 * * column 54, line 11 - column 57, line 48; figures 13,14 *; | [A]US2004001048 (KRAUS MARK GERARD [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,8,9,11,12* paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054]; figures 7,8 *; | [X]US2005248548 (TSUMURA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10,12 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078]; figures 9-11 * |