EP2119076 - AUTHENTICATION OF A DATA CARD USING A TRANSIT VERIFICATION VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visa U.S.A. Inc. P.O. Box 8999 San Francisco, CA 94128 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMAD, Ayman 6048 Corte Montanas Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | 02 /
DIXON, Philip B. 7389 Juncus Court San Diego, California 92129 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08743584.8 | 27.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US55195 | Priority number, date | US20070680594 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: US 680594 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008106560 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2119076 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4097 (US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3221 (EP,US);
G06Q20/326 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER DATENKARTE ÜBER EINEN ÜBERGANGSPRÜFWERT | [2009/47] | English: | AUTHENTICATION OF A DATA CARD USING A TRANSIT VERIFICATION VALUE | [2009/47] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION D'UNE CARTE DE DONNÉES AU MOYEN D'UNE VALEUR DE VÉRIFICATION DE TRANSACTION | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 25.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/50] | 03.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2014 | 09.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 56 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due tot heir notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion and the reference below. XP002456414 [L] 1-26 | International search | [Y]US2003216927 (SRIDHAR V [IN], et al) [Y] 18-19, 29-30* entire document *; | [Y]US2005165695 (BERARDI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * entire document *; | [Y]US2006161435 (ATEF FARSHEED [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * entire document * |