EP2134647 - OZONE CLEANING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Food Safety Technology, Llc 1004 Farnam Street Suite 103 Omaha, Nebraska 68102 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYNN, Daniel W. 3418 South 165th Avenue Omaha, Nebraska 68130 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Chalk, Anthony John, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Chalk, Anthony John, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08743872.7 | 14.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US56936 | Priority number, date | US20070894746P | 14.03.2007 Original published format: US 894746 P | US20080047461 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: US 47461 | US20080047442 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: US 47442 | US20080047498 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: US 47498 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008112947 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134647 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/10, C02F1/78, // B01F5/00, C11D3/39, B01F5/04, B01F13/06, B01F3/04, C11D11/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
C11D3/3947 (EP,US);
B01F23/23211 (EP,US);
B01F23/2323 (EP,US);
B01F23/237613 (EP,US);
B01F23/29 (EP,US);
B01F25/104 (EP,US);
B01F25/3121 (EP,US);
B01F33/71 (EP,US);
C01B13/10 (EP,US);
B01F2215/0468 (EP,US);
B08B2203/005 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C11D2111/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | C01B13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | 09.12.2009 | BA | 09.12.2009 | MK | 09.12.2009 | RS | 09.12.2009 | Title | German: | OZONREINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/52] | English: | OZONE CLEANING SYSTEM | [2009/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE À L'OZONE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 19.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/10] | Appeal following examination | 10.05.2011 | Appeal received No. J0009/11 | 19.07.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5186841 (SCHICK ROBERT P [US]) [X] 15 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 62 - line 65 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 15 * [Y] 1-7,11-14; | [XYI]US5556200 (EKHOLM ROLF [SE], et al) [X] 8,9 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 11; figure 5 * * column 1, line 15 - line 20 * [Y] 1-7,11-14 [I] 10; | [Y]US6106731 (HAYES CHARLES R [US]) [Y] 1-7,11-14 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 59; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6964739 (BOYD BRIAN T [US], et al) [Y] 4,6* column 4, line 55 - line 60 *; | [XY]US2006081541 (KOZYUK OLEG V [US]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0019] - paragraph [0033]; figures 3-4; table 1 * [Y] 1-7,11-14 | International search | [Y]US4801310 (BIELEFELDT ERNST-AUGUST [DE]); | [Y]US5865995 (NELSON WILLIAM R [US]); | [X]US6039815 (YEOL OH EUI [JP], et al); | [X]US6964739 (BOYD BRIAN T [US], et al) |