EP2139469 - COBALAMIN TAXANE BIOCONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inflabloc Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2150 W. Danuntless Ave 101 Salt Lake City, UT 84116 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBHARD, John, R. 1936 S. Laurelhurst Dr. Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | 02 /
VOLLMER, David 8649 Mcginnis Lane West Jordan, UT 84088 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Dinesh P.O. Box 58887 Salt Lake City, UT 84158 / US | 04 /
DAUGHERTY, Claire 1879 S. 1200 E. Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Walker, Ross Thomson Potts, Kerr & Co. 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08743911.3 | 14.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US57038 | Priority number, date | US20070919121P | 19.03.2007 Original published format: US 919121 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008115805 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2139469 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/335, C07D305/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/335 (KR);
A61K47/02 (KR);
A61K47/551 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07D305/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | COBALAMINTAXAN-BIOKONJUGATE | [2010/01] | English: | COBALAMIN TAXANE BIOCONJUGATES | [2010/01] | French: | BIOCONJUGUÉS DE COBALAMINE TAXANE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 09.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0128592 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * claims 25,46-48,112-114 * [I] 8; | [Y]US2004047917 (WILSON STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO9808859 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-7,9,10,17 *; | [Y] - PATHARE P M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF COBALAMIN-BIOTIN CONJUGATES THAT VARY IN THE POSITION OF COBALAMIN COUPLING. EVALUATION OF COBALAMIN DERIVATIVE BINDING TO TRANSCOBALAMIN II", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19960301), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1021/BC9600022, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 217 - 232, XP000558422 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc9600022 | International search | [A]US6515017 (LI CHUN [US], et al) |