EP2171988 - DISTRIBUTED MODE SPEAKER FOR MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EATON, William Chris 204 Wentbridge Road Cary, NC 27519 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08744025.1 | 19.03.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US57396 | Priority number, date | US20070774103 | 06.07.2007 Original published format: US 774103 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009009168 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171988 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/03, H04R7/04 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04M1/03 (EP,US);
H04M1/0227 (EP,US);
H04M1/0237 (EP,US);
H04R7/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHER MIT VERTEILTEM MODUS FÜR MOBILGERÄTE | [2010/14] | English: | DISTRIBUTED MODE SPEAKER FOR MOBILE DEVICES | [2010/14] | French: | HAUT-PARLEUR EN MODE RÉPARTI POUR DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 09.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004054317 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 11 - page 5, line 12 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [Y]EP1301012 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO02104065 (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 22 * * page 7, line 6 - page 10, line 19 * * figures 1-3b *; | [A]WO2007045908 (SFX TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |