EP2142562 - STITCHED POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERDINE, Gregory, L. 52 Hyde Avenue Newton, MA 02458 / US | 02 /
KIM, Young-Woo 129 Sycamore Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/02] | 01 /
VERDINE, Gregory, L. 52 Hyde Avenue Newton, MA 02458 / US | ||
02 /
KIM, Young-woo 129 Sycamore Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/02] | Hodges, Julia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744544.1 | 28.03.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008US58575 | Priority number, date | US20070908566P | 28.03.2007 Original published format: US 908566 P | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008121767 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2142562 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2142562 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/107, C07K7/56, C07K1/113 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C07K7/56 (KR);
C07K1/1075 (US);
A61K38/12 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP,KR);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP,KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP,KR);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C229/30 (US);
C07K1/107 (KR);
C07K1/113 (EP,US);
C07K14/001 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (US);
C07K14/4705 (US);
C07K14/4746 (EP,US);
C07K14/4747 (US);
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Y301/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16322 (US);
C12N2770/24222 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHEFTETE POLYPEPTIDE | [2010/02] | English: | STITCHED POLYPEPTIDES | [2010/02] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES COUSUS | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 02.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12159110.1 / EP2508531 | EP16182714.2 / EP3159352 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2008 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | LU | 28.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.03.2008 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004041275 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 18 * page 60; claim - *; | [Y]WO2005044839 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claim - *; | [X]US2006008848 (VERDINE GREGORY L [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0038] , [0048] , [0052] , [0053]; figures 2,5; claims 3,10 *; | [E]WO2008061192 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC, et al) [E] 1-20 * claim - *; | [E]WO2008095063 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * claim - *; | [Y] - WALENSKY LOREN D ET AL, "A stapled BID BH3 helix directly binds and activates BAX.", MOLECULAR CELL 20 OCT 2006, (20061020), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1097-2765, pages 199 - 210, XP009107657 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14787210.4.2.261 | [Y] - BERNAL FEDERICO ET AL, "Reactivation of the p53 tumor suppressor pathway by a stapled p53 peptide.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 7 MAR 2007, (20070207), vol. 129, no. 9, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2456 - 2457, XP009107955 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0693587 | [Y] - WALENSKY L D ET AL, "Activation of apoptosis in vivo by a hydrocarbon-stapled BH3 helix", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, WASHINGTON, DC, (20040101), vol. 305, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1466 - 1470, XP002491411 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1099191 | [Y] - PHELAN J C ET AL, "A GENERAL METHOD FOR CONSTRAINING SHORT PEPTIDES TO AN ASPIRE- HELICAL CONFORMATION", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, US, (19970122), vol. 119, no. 3, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 455 - 460, XP002059088 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9611654 | [X] - ROOS ERIC C ET AL, "Synthesis of alpha-substituted alpha-amino acids via cationic intermediates", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 58, no. 12, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3259 - 3268, XP009108003 [X] 18 * compound 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00064a011 | [X] - ELLIS TREVOR K ET AL, "Design, synthesis, and evaluation of a new generation of modular nucleophilic glycine equivalents for the efficient synthesis of sterically constrained alpha-amino acids.", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY 27 OCT 2006, (20061027), vol. 71, no. 22, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8572 - 8578, XP009108010 [X] 18 * compound 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0616198 | by applicant | US4270537 | US4596556 | US4790824 | US4886499 | US4940460 | US4941880 | US5015235 | US5064413 | US5141496 | US5190521 | US5312335 | US5328483 | US5334144 | US5339163 | US5383851 | US5417662 | US5466220 | US5480381 | US5503627 | US5520639 | US5527288 | US5569189 | US5599302 | WO9713537 | US5649912 | WO9737705 | US5704911 | US5811515 | US5893397 | WO9934850 | US5993412 | US2004067503 | US2005250680 | US2006008848 | - BABINE ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1997), vol. 97, page 1359 | - GANTE, J. ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 1699 - 1720 | - R. M. J. LISKAMP, RECL. TRAV. CHIM. PAYS-BAS, (1994), vol. 113, page 1 | - GIANNIS, T. KOLTER, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1993), vol. 32, page 1244 | - P. D. BAILEY, Peptide Chemistry, WILEY, (1990), page 182 | - PHELAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, page 455 | - LEUC ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, page 11273 | - BRACKEN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, page 6432 | - YAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 14, page 1403 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, no. 16 | - BLACKWELL ET AL., ANGEW CHEM. INT. ED., (1994), vol. 37, page 3281 | - SCHAFMIESTER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - WALENSKY ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, pages 1466 - 1470 | - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics | - WILEN, S.H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S.H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "pharmaceutically acceptable salts in detail", J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - WALENSKY ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, page 1466 | - GRUBBS ET AL., ACC. CHEM. RES., (1995), vol. 28, pages 446 - 452 | - SCHROCK ET AL., ORGANOMETALLICS, (1982), vol. 1, page 1645 | - GALLIVAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, pages 2577 - 2580 | - FURSTNER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, page 9453 | - CHEM. EUR. J., (2001), vol. 7, page 5299 | - FURSTNER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, page 12349 | - VAICKUS, L., CRIT REV. IN ONCOL./HEMOTOL., (1991), vol. 11, pages 267 - 97 | - SHAIR, CHEM. & BIOL., (1997), vol. 4, page 791 | - HARPER ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 364, page 1757 | - SCHAFMEISTER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - BIERZYNSKI, A.; KIM, P. S.; BALDWIN, R. L., PROC. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1982), vol. 79, pages 2470 - 2474 | - SCHAFMEISTER, C. E.; PO, J.; VERDINE, G. L., JAM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - DENMARK, S. E.; STAVENGER, R. A.; FAUCHER, A.-M.; EDWARDS, J. P., J. ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, pages 3375 - 3389 | - NODE ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46 | - FAVRIN, G.; IRBÄCK, A.; SAMUELSSON, B.; WALLIN, S., BIOPHYSIC. J., (2003), vol. 85, pages 1457 - 1465 | - SCHRODINGER, MACROMODEL, (2005), vol. 9.1 | - STILL, W. C.; TEMPCZYK, A.; HAWLELY, R. C.; HENDRICKSON, T. A., "A General Treatment of Solvation for Molecular Mechanics", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 6127 - 6129 |