EP2131771 - SECURING DEVICE TO SECURE FIXATION DEVICES TO BONE PORTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOUTENS, Robert, J. Hardstrasse 30 CH-4052 Basel / CH | 02 /
NAITO, Kan 2-13-17 Fuda Chofu-City Tokyo / JP | 03 /
ENGENHARDT, Ulrich Auf der Steinung 32 D-88518 Herbertingen / DE | 04 /
WIESMANN, Bruno Bahnhofstrasse 8 CH-3375 Inkwil / CH | 05 /
STRAUB, Benjamin 6 rue des Pres F-68128 Village-Neuf / FR | 06 /
OESTERLEIN, Ralf Willi-Brandt Allee 36 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
SCHOUTENS, Robert, J. Hardstrasse 30 CH-4052 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
NAITO, Kan 2-13-17 Fuda Chofu-City Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
ENGENHARDT, Ulrich Auf der Steinung 32 D-88518 Herbertingen / CH | |||
04 /
WIESMANN, Bruno Bahnhofstrasse 8 CH-3375 Inkwil / CH | |||
05 /
STRAUB, Benjamin 6 rue des Pres F-68128 Village-Neuf / FR | |||
06 /
OESTERLEIN, Ralf Willi-Brandt Allee 36 79111 Freiburg / DE | |||
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
SCHOUTENS, Robert, J. Hardstrasse 30 CH-4052 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
NAITO, Kan 2-13-17 Fuda Chofu-City Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
ENGENHARDT, Ulrich Claragraben 115 CH-4057 Basel / CH | |||
04 /
WIESMANN, Bruno Bahnhofstrasse 8 CH-3375 Inkwil / CH | |||
05 /
STRAUB, Benjamin 6 rue des Pres F-68128 Village-Neuf / FR | |||
06 /
OESTERLEIN, Ralf Willi-Brandt Allee 36 79111 Freiburg / DE | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Lusuardi, Werther Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 08745010.2 | 03.04.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US59243 | Priority number, date | US20070784331 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: US 784331 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008124484 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2131771 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2131771 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/88, B65B13/02, A61B17/68 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/688 (EP,US);
A61B17/88 (KR);
A61B17/68 (KR);
A61B17/8861 (US);
A61B17/8863 (EP,US);
A61B17/8869 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON FIXIERVORRICHTUNGEN AN KNOCHENTEILEN | [2009/51] | English: | SECURING DEVICE TO SECURE FIXATION DEVICES TO BONE PORTIONS | [2009/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOLIDARISATION POUR ASSUJETTIR DES DISPOSITIFS DE FIXATION À DES PARTIES OSSEUSES | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HR | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | MT | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | NO | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | IE | 03.04.2011 | LU | 03.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
TR | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.04.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.04.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | BE | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0581020 (UNITED CARR GMBH TRW [DE]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 5, lines 30-41 *; | [A]FR2695171 (GHAWI ROGER [FR]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [A]DE19832798 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6-9,15-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2005240191 (ALBERTSON THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** paragraph [0057] * |