EP2145301 - LOG PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Google, Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Geoffrey, R. 572 Franklin Street Mountain View, California 94041 / US | 02 /
MERRICK, Iain Flat 136 The Beaux-Arts Building 10-18 Manor Gardens London N7 6JS / GB | 03 /
KILLIANEY, Michael, A. 29 Eccelston Square Flat 1 London SW1V 1NZ / GB | 04 /
HAWKINS, John, Alastair 205 Hood House Dolphin Square London SW1V 3NQ / GB | 05 /
HECHT, Greg 142 Paseo Court Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 06 /
ROWE, Simon 32 The Spinney Finchampstead Berkshire / GB | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Robinson, David Edward Ashdown, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Schley, Jan Malte Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08745048.2 | 03.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US59318 | Priority number, date | US20070909893P | 03.04.2007 Original published format: US 909893 P | US20070915261P | 01.05.2007 Original published format: US 915261 P | US20070944992P | 19.06.2007 Original published format: US 944992 P | US20070852791 | 10.09.2007 Original published format: US 852791 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008124545 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145301 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (US);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0273 (EP,US);
H04N21/2407 (EP,US);
H04N21/2547 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | PROTOKOLLVERARBEITUNG | [2010/03] | English: | LOG PROCESSING | [2010/03] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE JOURNAL | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/40] | 31.08.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2016 | 13.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9945700 (PREVUE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 7 - page 27; figures 1-15 *; | [I]US2003110497 (YASSIN AMR F [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]EP1549055 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-15 * page 4 - page 37 * * figures 1-8,10,13-15 *; | [I]WO2006020560 (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 7 - page 45 * * abstract *; | [I]WO2006127645 (KLOPF STEVEN [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20000054179 (N S WELL CO LTD); | [A]KR20030070275 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2006020560 (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US], et al); | [A]KR20060097268 (LEE MI JEONG [KR], et al) | by applicant | WO9945700 | US2003110497 | EP1549055 | WO2006020560 | WO2006127645 |