EP2140337 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOW BANDWIDTH PLAY POSITION PREVIEWING OF VIDEO CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Fountain, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OPPENHEIMER, Charles 1720 Oakdell Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | O'Neill, Aoife, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | O'Neill, Aoife, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08745878.2 | 15.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US60363 | Priority number, date | US20070738778 | 23.04.2007 Original published format: US 738778 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130936 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140337 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G09G5/08, H04N5/00 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F16/745 (EP,US);
G06F3/03 (KR);
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G09G5/08 (KR);
G11B27/326 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N21/21 (EP,US);
H04N21/23 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/2387 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | G06F3/033, G09G5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSPIELPOSITIONSVORANSICHT VON VIDEOINHALTEN MIT GERINGER BANDBREITE | [2010/01] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOW BANDWIDTH PLAY POSITION PREVIEWING OF VIDEO CONTENT | [2010/01] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE PRÉVISUALISATION DE POSITION DE LECTURE À FAIBLE BANDE PASSANTE D'UN CONTENU VIDÉO | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 02.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 01.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1024444 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 1,12-14 *; | [A]US2005010955 (ELIA ERIC J [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1513151 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] ** figure 3 *; | [I]WO2005101408 (FORBIDDEN TECHNOLOGIES PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - line 20 * * page 2, line 3 - line 12 * * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, line 14 - line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [I]EP1758383 (AT & T CORP [US]) [I] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * figure 2B * | International search | [A]US2004086264 (OKADA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2005010955 (ELIA ERIC J [US], et al); | [A]US2006239646 (KANG SUNG S [KR]) |