EP2150279 - Vaporized hydrogen peroxide probe calibration rig [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | VAPORIZED HYDROGEN PEROXIDE PROBE CALIBRATION RIG | ||
[2012/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Sterilizer Company 5960 Heisley Road Mentor, OH 44060-1834 / US | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Aaron, L. 8935 Horeshoe Dr. Erie, PA 16510 / US | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2010/06] | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver, et al Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08746388.1 | 21.04.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008US60959 | Priority number, date | US20070740973 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: US 740973 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134270 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150279 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2150279 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, A61L2/24, A61L2/28 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G01N33/0006 (EP,US);
A61L2/20 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | Kalibrationsvorrichtung für Sensoren von dampfförmigem Wasserstoffperoxid | [2012/23] | English: | Vaporized hydrogen peroxide probe calibration rig | [2012/23] | French: | Appareil de calibrage de sonde de peroxyde d'hydrogène vaporisé | [2012/23] |
Former [2010/06] | SONDENKALIBRATIONSSTAND FÜR VERDAMPFTES WASSERSTOFFPEROXID | ||
Former [2010/06] | VAPORIZED HYDROGEN PEROXIDE PROBE CALIBRATION RIG | ||
Former [2010/06] | APPAREIL DE CALIBRAGE DE SONDE DE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE VAPORISÉ | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 14.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2008 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | GB | 21.04.2013 | IE | 21.04.2013 | IT | 21.04.2013 | LU | 21.04.2013 | ES | 22.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | FR | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.04.2013 | ||
IE | 21.04.2013 | ||
IT | 21.04.2013 | ||
ES | 22.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.04.2013 | ||
IE | 21.04.2013 | ||
IT | 21.04.2013 | ||
ES | 22.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.04.2013 | ||
IE | 21.04.2013 | ||
IT | 21.04.2013 | ||
ES | 22.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.04.2013 | ||
IE | 21.04.2013 | ||
IT | 21.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.04.2013 | ||
IT | 21.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
FR | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
GB | 21.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1686375 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y] - TAIZO I ET AL, "APPLICATION OF A NEWLY DEVELOPED HYDROGE PEROXIDE VAPOR PHASE SENSOR TO HPV STERILIZER", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (19980101), vol. 52, no. 1, ISSN 1079-7440, pages 13 - 18, XP001083519 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2006088441 (HILL AARON L [US]); | [Y]US4045721 (SWAIN WILLIAM H); | [Y]US4956145 (CUMMINGS ARTHUR L [US], et al) |