EP2156321 - CUSTOMIZABLE MEDIA CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Google, Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSWEILER, III, Richard C. 986 Alpine Terrace 4 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
SAHAMI, Mehran 3950 El Cerrito Rd. Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Manish G. 542 Union St. San Francisco, CA 94133 / US | 04 /
BLACKBURN, John 13507 242nd Ave NE Woodinville, WA 98077 / US | 05 /
BROWN, David A. 286 Vincent Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | 06 /
GUPTA, Neha 365 Sun Ridge Lane San Jose, California 95123 / US | 07 /
TAYLOR, Thomas H. 6308 227th Ave NE Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | [2010/18] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
GOSSWEILER, III, Richard C. 986 Alpine Terrace 4 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | ||
02 /
SAHAMI, Mehran 3950 El Cerrito Rd. Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | |||
03 /
PATEL, Manish G. 542 Union St. San Francisco, CA 94133 / US | |||
04 /
BLACKBURN, John 14259 SE 83rd Street Newcastle, Washington 98059 / US | |||
05 /
BROWN, David A. 286 Vincent Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | |||
06 /
GUPTA, Neha 365 Sun Ridge Lane San Jose, California 95123 / US | |||
07 /
TAYLOR, Thomas H. 6308 227th Ave NE Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | |||
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
GOSSWEILER, III, Richard C. 986 Alpine Terrace 4 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | ||
02 /
SAHAMI, Mehran 3950 El Cerrito Rd. Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | |||
03 /
PATEL, Manish G. 100 N. Whisman Road, 4014 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
04 /
BLACKBURN, John 14259 SE 83rd Street Newcastle, Washington 98059 / US | |||
05 /
BROWN, David A. 286 Vincent Drive Mountain View, California 94041 / US | |||
06 /
GUPTA, Neha 365 Sun Ridge Lane San Jose, California 95123 / US | |||
07 /
TAYLOR, Thomas H. 6308 227th Ave NE Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Schley, Jan Malte Fish & Richardson P.C. Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08747213.0 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US62058 | Priority number, date | US20070742495 | 30.04.2007 Original published format: US 742495 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134742 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156321 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, H04N5/445, H04N7/08 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04N21/254 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/4227 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/45 (KR);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | ANPASSBARE MEDIENKANÄLE | [2010/08] | English: | CUSTOMIZABLE MEDIA CHANNELS | [2010/08] | French: | CANAUX DE MÉDIA PERSONNALISABLES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 30.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0594350 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0620689 (CABLE SERVICE TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPH11338872 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [YA]US6025837 (MATTHEWS III JOSEPH H [US], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1,9,13,14; | [XY]WO0040027 (NTL GROUP LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * page 10, line 3 - page 17, line 2 * * page 21, line 17 - page 22, line 15 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 2; | [A]WO02103470 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 8 * * page 16, line 10 - page 18, line 13 *; | [A]US2004210932 (MORI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0105] - [0107] - [0126] , [0134] * | International search | [A]US5592551 (LETT DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, claim 1 *; | [A]US6721955 (KHOO DENIS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, claim 1 *; | [A]US2004123318 (LEE HEE KYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, fig. 1, claim 1 *; | [A]KR100703279B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* See abstract, fig. 2, claim 1 * |