EP2155730 - AMINOPYRIMIDINES USEFUL AS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTIMORE, Michael Unit 88 Milton Park, Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | 02 /
GOLEC, Julian Unit 88 Milton Park, Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | 03 /
ROBINSON, Daniel 27 Jackman Close, Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3GH / GB | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Coles, Andrea Birgit, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Coles, Andrea Birgit, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08747432.6 | 02.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US62330 | Priority number, date | US20070915579P | 02.05.2007 Original published format: US 915579 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008137622 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2155730 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | ALS KINASEINHIBITOREN GEEIGNETE AMINOPYRIMIDINE | [2010/08] | English: | AMINOPYRIMIDINES USEFUL AS KINASE INHIBITORS | [2010/08] | French: | AMINOPYRIMIDINES SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS DE KINASES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 11.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/26] | 18.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2015 | 10.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0250065 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-68 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO03078426 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-68 * examples II-9; table 2 *; | [X]WO03078427 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-68 * page 21 - page 22; examples II-11 *; | [X]WO03077921 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-68 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2004000833 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-68 * examples I-10,I-20,I-21; table 4 *; | [X]WO2004037814 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-68* the whole document *; | [X]US2005038023 (BEBBINGTON DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1-68 * the whole document * |