EP2156313 - INTER-PROCESS COMMUNICATION METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR BUILDING SCALABLE/REDUNDANT TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYNARSKI, Richard J. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
KELLEMAN, James 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
MAZIK, David R. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08747495.3 | 02.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US62408 | Priority number, date | US20070916247P | 04.05.2007 Original published format: US 916247 P | US20080112961 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 112961 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008137668 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2156313 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/167, H04L12/58 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
H04L12/189 (EP,KR,US);
G06F15/167 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN DER KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN PROZESSEN ZUM AUFBAU VON SKALIERBAREN/REDUNDANTEN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2010/08] | English: | INTER-PROCESS COMMUNICATION METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR BUILDING SCALABLE/REDUNDANT TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | [2010/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION INTERPROCESSUS POUR CONSTRUIRE DES SYSTÈMES DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION EXTENSIBLES/REDONDANTS | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003069939 (RUSSELL LANCE W [US]) [Y] 2-5,10-13,18-21,26-29,34-37 * paragraphs [0032] - [0065] *; | [X]US2004031033 (CHANDRA RAVI [US], et al) [X] 6-8,14-16,22-24,30-32,38-40* paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figures 3,4 *; | [XY]US2004039774 (XU MING [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9,14-17,22-25,30-33,38-40 * paragraphs [0024] - [0078] * [Y] 2-5,10-13,18-21,26-29,34-37 | Examination | WO9401832 | by applicant | US2004031033 | US2004039774 |