EP2164576 - RESPIRATOR HAVING A HARNESS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND FITTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Heonyung 19th Floor, Daehan Investment and Securities Building 27-3 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-705 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jin-ho 19th Floor, Daehan Investment and Securities Building 27-3 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-705 / KR | 03 /
NAGAOSA, Tomoo 33-1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 04 /
LEE, Kyoungho 19th Floor, Daehan Investment and Securities Building 27-3 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-705 / KR | 05 /
KUNIYA, Isao 33-1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 06 /
YASUDA, Koshi 33-1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 07 /
MIYASHITA, Kiyoshi 33-1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Towlson, Samantha Jayne, et al 3M Europe S.A./N.V. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Towlson, Samantha Jayne 3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | ||
Former [2010/12] | Towlson, Samantha Jayne 3M United Kingdom PLC 3M Centre Cain Road GB-Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08747617.2 | 05.05.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008US62605 | Priority number, date | US20070769768 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: US 769768 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009002608 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164576 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/08, A41D13/11, A62B23/02 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A62B18/084 (EP,KR,US);
A62B18/025 (KR);
A41D13/1161 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A62B23/025 (EP,KR,US);
A61M16/0683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | ATEMSCHUTZGERÄT MIT EINEM GURT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND ANBRINGUNG | [2010/12] | English: | RESPIRATOR HAVING A HARNESS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND FITTING THE SAME | [2010/12] | French: | RESPIRATEUR AYANT UN HARNAIS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET D'AJUSTEMENT DE CELUI-CI | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 11.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4062357 (LAERDAL ASMUND SIGURD) [X] 1-4,6,10-13,15,18,19 * figure 9 * [I] 5,7-9,14,16,17,20-22; | [XIA]US3013556 (GALLEHER JR ELLIS A) [X] 1,3,7,8,10,12,16-22 * figure - * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 38 * [I] 5,6,14,15 [A] 2,4,9,11,13; | [XIA]WO9906116 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9,10,14,16 * claims 14-18 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6,8,15,17 [A] 2-4,11-13,18-22 |