EP2155027 - A MULTIPLE BLADE ACCESSORY FOR A FOOD PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Breville PTY Limited Building 2 Port Air Industrial Estate 1A Hale Street Botany, NSW 2019 / AU | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, Garth 1 Harper Street Helensburgh, NSW 2508 / AU | 02 /
HENSEL, Keith, James 44 Karilla Avenue Lane Cove, New South Wales 2066 / AU | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Williams, Ceili, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08748037.2 | 04.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008AU00794 | Priority number, date | AU20070902986P | 04.06.2007 Original published format: AU 2007902986 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008148152 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155027 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47J44/00, B02C18/08, B02C18/20, A47J43/04, B02C18/18 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
A47J43/0722 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | ZUBEHÖRTEIL MIT MEHREREN MESSERN FÜR EINE KÜCHENMASCHINE | [2010/08] | English: | A MULTIPLE BLADE ACCESSORY FOR A FOOD PROCESSOR | [2010/08] | French: | ACCESSOIRE À LAMES MULTIPLES POUR ROBOT MÉNAGER | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 04.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004056130 (GURSEL ILHAN [TR]) [Y] 1-11,15 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * [A] 12-14; | [Y]WO2006056021 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-11,15 * abstract * * figure 1 ** paragraph [0018] * | International search | [A]DE29612865U ; | [A]US2004046075 (GURSEL ILHAN [TR]); | [A]US2004056130 (GURSEL ILHAN [TR]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 46, Database accession no. 1996-456857, XP008117896 & DE29612865U U1 19961010 (CHEN T) |