EP2155644 - ORGANIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANIER, Thierry Zeisigweg 7 CH-8600 Duebendorf / CH | 02 /
HANHART, Andreas Speerstrasse 5 CH-8610 Uster / CH | 03 /
BAJGROWICZ, Jerzy, A. Wiesliacher 45 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Sievert, Claudia, et al Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Überlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Sievert, Claudia, et al Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Überlandstrasse 138 CH-8600 Dübendorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 08748378.0 | 03.06.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008CH00248 | Priority number, date | GB20070010703 | 05.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0710703 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008148235 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155644 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155644 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/557, C11B9/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C07C49/557 (EP,US);
C11B9/0034 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2010/08] | English: | ORGANIC COMPOUNDS | [2010/08] | French: | COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2010 | BE | 17.11.2010 | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HR | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | IT | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | LV | 17.11.2010 | MT | 17.11.2010 | NL | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | NO | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | IE | 03.06.2011 | LU | 03.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
LU | 03.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2242751 (FIRMENICH & CIE) [X] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 4 ** page 14 - page 15; example 1 *; | [X]US3946078 (RAUTENSTRAUCH VALENTIN, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 40 - line 50 * * column 8, line 30 - line 68 * |