EP2152957 - FLUOROCARBON POLYMER-FREE PREPARATIONS BASED ON WATER AND/OR ORGANIC SOLVENTS AND THE USE THEREOF AS A FINISH ON FLEXIBLE SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rudolf GmbH Altvaterstr. 58-64 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Rudolf GmbH & Co. KG Chemische Fabrik Altvaterstrasse 58-64 82538 Geretsried / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUSCHEK, Gunther Caspar-Feichtmayr-Str. 21 83671 Benediktbeuren / DE | 02 /
SIELEMANN, Dirk Kräuterstrasse 36b 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
DUSCHEK, Gunther Caspar-Feichtmayr-Str. 21 83671 Benediktbeuren / DE | ||
02 /
SIELEMANN, Dirk Ludwig-Wörl-Weg 40 81375 München / DE | Representative(s) | Zumstein, Angela Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Zumstein, Angela Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749231.0 | 29.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008EP03478 | Priority number, date | DE20071020790 | 03.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007020790 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008135208 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152957 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152957 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/395, D06M15/564, D06M15/568, D06M15/572, D06M15/643, C08G77/388, C08L83/04 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
D06M15/564 (EP,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/3281 (EP,US);
C08G18/36 (EP,US);
C08G18/71 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08G18/8029 (EP,US);
D06M13/395 (EP,US);
D06M15/568 (EP,US);
D06M15/572 (EP,US);
D06M15/643 (EP,US);
D06M2200/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | FLUORKOHLENSTOFFPOLYMER-FREIE ZUBEREITUNGEN AUF BASIS VON WASSER UND/ODER ORGANISCHEN LÖSEMITTELN UND DEREN ANWENDUNG ALS APPRETUR AUF FLÄCHENGEBILDEN | [2010/07] | English: | FLUOROCARBON POLYMER-FREE PREPARATIONS BASED ON WATER AND/OR ORGANIC SOLVENTS AND THE USE THEREOF AS A FINISH ON FLEXIBLE SHEET MATERIAL | [2010/07] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS À BASE D'EAU ET/OU DE SOLVANTS ORGANIQUES EXEMPTES DE POLYMÈRE DE FLUOROCARBONE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE FINI SUR DES STRUCTURES PLATES | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 26.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | HR | 22.09.2010 | HU | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | MT | 22.09.2010 | PL | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | NO | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | LU | 29.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
LU | 29.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 22.09.2010 | |
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
LU | 29.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
LU | 29.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | EE | 22.09.2010 | |
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03078725 (RUDOLF GMBH & CO KG CHEM FAB [DE], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03085015 (HANSA TEXTILCHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 3 ** page 2, paragraph 4; claim - * |