EP2016138 - ANTI-CORROSION SYSTEM FOR METALS AND PIGMENT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voestalpine Stahl GmbH Voestalpine-Strasse 3 4020 Linz / AT | [2016/29] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Voestalpine Stahl GmbH Voestalpinestrasse 3 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Voestalpine Stahl GmbH Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIEWASSER, Franz Dietraching 2 4982 St. Georgen / AT | 02 /
STELLNBERGER, Karl-Heinz Kirchholz 3 AT-4491 Niederneukirchen / AT | 03 /
WIESINGER, Siegfried Zeilerberg 79 4231 Wartberg / AT | 04 /
HAGLER, Josef Hubertusgasse 66 4060 Leonding / AT | 05 /
LUCKENEDER, Gerald Leitenstrasse 11 4812 Pinsdorf / AT | [2010/17] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
PRIEWASSER, Franz Dietraching 2 4982 St. Georgen / AT | ||
02 /
STELLNBERGER, Karl-Heinz Krichholz 3 4491 Niederneukirchen / AT | |||
03 /
WIESINGER, Siegfried Zeilerberg 79 4231 Wartberg / AT | |||
04 /
HAGLER, Josef Hubertusgasse 66 4060 Leonding / AT | |||
05 /
LUCKENEDER, Gerald Leitenstrasse 11 4812 Pinsdorf / AT | Representative(s) | Naefe, Jan Robert, et al Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neumarkter Strasse 18 81673 München / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2013/10] | Naefe, Jan Robert, et al PATRONUS IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | nospat Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Naefe Oberdorfer Schmidt Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08749406.8 | 08.05.2008 | [2009/04] | WO2008EP03718 | Priority number, date | DE20071021602 | 08.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007021602 | [2009/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008135292 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2016138 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016138 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2016138 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/08 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
C09D5/082 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C09D201/00 (KR);
C09D5/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KORROSIONSSCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR METALLE UND PIGMENT HIERFÜR | [2009/04] | English: | ANTI-CORROSION SYSTEM FOR METALS AND PIGMENT THEREFOR | [2009/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION POUR MÉTAUX ET PIGMENT ASSOCIÉ | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.04.2011
21.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Tata Steel UK Ltd 30 Millbank London SW1P 4WY / GB Opponent's representative Herman de Groot, Johan Willem, et al, et al Tata Steel Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [2011/21] | 20.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.09.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.06.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | HR | 14.07.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | IE | 14.07.2010 | LT | 14.07.2010 | LV | 14.07.2010 | MT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | PL | 14.07.2010 | PT | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | NO | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | IS | 14.11.2010 | LU | 08.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | AT | 08.05.2013 | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/09] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
AT | 08.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
AT | 08.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 08.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
HR | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
NO | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004037542 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* claims 1-3 *; | [PA]DE102005059614 (NANO X GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-3,18-20 * claims 1,3-9 * |